EP3765458 - O-GLYCOPROTEIN-2-ACETAMIDO-2-DEOXY-3-D-GLYCOPYRANOSIDASE INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.11.2023 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.12.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.07.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.10.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.12.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.09.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 08.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE, SI | published on 20.03.2024 [2024/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Biogen MA Inc. 225 Binney Street Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | [2021/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GENUNG, Nathan c/o Biogen MA Inc. 225 Binney Street Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | 02 /
GUCKIAN, Kevin M. c/o Biogen MA Inc. 225 Binney Street Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | 03 /
VESSELS, Jeffrey c/o Biogen MA Inc. 225 Binney Street Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | 04 /
ZHANG, Lei c/o Biogen MA Inc. 225 Binney Street Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | 05 /
GIANATASSIO, Ryan c/o Biogen MA Inc. 225 Binney Street Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | 06 /
LIN, Edward Yin Shiang c/o Biogen MA Inc. 225 Binney Street Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | 07 /
XIN, Zhili c/o Biogen MA Inc. 225 Binney Street Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | [2021/03] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [2023/02] |
Former [2021/03] | HGF 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | Application number, filing date | 19713945.4 | 13.03.2019 | [2021/03] | WO2019US21995 | Priority number, date | US201862642932P | 14.03.2018 Original published format: US 201862642932 P | US201862690536P | 27.06.2018 Original published format: US 201862690536 P | US201862699443P | 17.07.2018 Original published format: US 201862699443 P | [2021/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019178191 | Date: | 19.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3765458 | Date: | 20.01.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.09.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3765458 | Date: | 11.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.09.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C07D417/06, C07D417/14, C07D495/04, A61P25/28, A61K31/427, A61K31/445 | [2021/03] | CPC: |
A61P25/28 (EP);
C07D417/14 (EP,US);
C07D417/06 (US);
C07D471/04 (US);
C07D495/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/03] | Extension states | BA | 08.10.2020 | ME | 08.10.2020 | Validation states | KH | 08.10.2020 | MA | 08.10.2020 | MD | 08.10.2020 | TN | 08.10.2020 | Title | German: | O-GLYCOPROTEIN-2-ACETAMIDO-2-DEOXY-3-D-GLYCOPYRANOSIDASE-INHIBITOREN | [2021/03] | English: | O-GLYCOPROTEIN-2-ACETAMIDO-2-DEOXY-3-D-GLYCOPYRANOSIDASE INHIBITORS | [2021/03] | French: | INHIBITEURS D'O-GLYCOPROTÉINE-2-ACÉTAMIDO-2-DÉSOXY-3-D-GLYCOPYRANOSIDASE | [2021/03] | Entry into regional phase | 08.10.2020 | National basic fee paid | 08.10.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.10.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.10.2020 | Examination requested [2021/03] | 08.10.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.05.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.04.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.07.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.12.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 01.12.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.12.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP23151036.3 / EP4186899 | Opposition(s) | 12.10.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.01.2023 | CZ | 11.01.2023 | DK | 11.01.2023 | EE | 11.01.2023 | FI | 11.01.2023 | HR | 11.01.2023 | LT | 11.01.2023 | LV | 11.01.2023 | MC | 11.01.2023 | NL | 11.01.2023 | PL | 11.01.2023 | RO | 11.01.2023 | RS | 11.01.2023 | SE | 11.01.2023 | SI | 11.01.2023 | SK | 11.01.2023 | SM | 11.01.2023 | IE | 13.03.2023 | LU | 13.03.2023 | BE | 31.03.2023 | CH | 31.03.2023 | LI | 31.03.2023 | NO | 11.04.2023 | GR | 12.04.2023 | IS | 11.05.2023 | PT | 11.05.2023 | [2024/11] |
Former [2024/09] | AT | 11.01.2023 | |
CZ | 11.01.2023 | ||
DK | 11.01.2023 | ||
EE | 11.01.2023 | ||
FI | 11.01.2023 | ||
HR | 11.01.2023 | ||
LT | 11.01.2023 | ||
LV | 11.01.2023 | ||
MC | 11.01.2023 | ||
NL | 11.01.2023 | ||
PL | 11.01.2023 | ||
RO | 11.01.2023 | ||
RS | 11.01.2023 | ||
SE | 11.01.2023 | ||
SK | 11.01.2023 | ||
SM | 11.01.2023 | ||
IE | 13.03.2023 | ||
LU | 13.03.2023 | ||
CH | 31.03.2023 | ||
LI | 31.03.2023 | ||
NO | 11.04.2023 | ||
GR | 12.04.2023 | ||
IS | 11.05.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AT | 11.01.2023 | |
CZ | 11.01.2023 | ||
DK | 11.01.2023 | ||
EE | 11.01.2023 | ||
FI | 11.01.2023 | ||
HR | 11.01.2023 | ||
LT | 11.01.2023 | ||
LV | 11.01.2023 | ||
MC | 11.01.2023 | ||
NL | 11.01.2023 | ||
PL | 11.01.2023 | ||
RO | 11.01.2023 | ||
RS | 11.01.2023 | ||
SE | 11.01.2023 | ||
SK | 11.01.2023 | ||
SM | 11.01.2023 | ||
IE | 13.03.2023 | ||
LU | 13.03.2023 | ||
NO | 11.04.2023 | ||
GR | 12.04.2023 | ||
IS | 11.05.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
Former [2024/02] | AT | 11.01.2023 | |
CZ | 11.01.2023 | ||
DK | 11.01.2023 | ||
EE | 11.01.2023 | ||
FI | 11.01.2023 | ||
HR | 11.01.2023 | ||
LT | 11.01.2023 | ||
LV | 11.01.2023 | ||
MC | 11.01.2023 | ||
NL | 11.01.2023 | ||
PL | 11.01.2023 | ||
RO | 11.01.2023 | ||
RS | 11.01.2023 | ||
SE | 11.01.2023 | ||
SK | 11.01.2023 | ||
SM | 11.01.2023 | ||
LU | 13.03.2023 | ||
NO | 11.04.2023 | ||
GR | 12.04.2023 | ||
IS | 11.05.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 11.01.2023 | |
CZ | 11.01.2023 | ||
DK | 11.01.2023 | ||
EE | 11.01.2023 | ||
FI | 11.01.2023 | ||
HR | 11.01.2023 | ||
LT | 11.01.2023 | ||
LV | 11.01.2023 | ||
MC | 11.01.2023 | ||
NL | 11.01.2023 | ||
PL | 11.01.2023 | ||
RO | 11.01.2023 | ||
RS | 11.01.2023 | ||
SE | 11.01.2023 | ||
SK | 11.01.2023 | ||
SM | 11.01.2023 | ||
NO | 11.04.2023 | ||
GR | 12.04.2023 | ||
IS | 11.05.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AT | 11.01.2023 | |
CZ | 11.01.2023 | ||
DK | 11.01.2023 | ||
EE | 11.01.2023 | ||
FI | 11.01.2023 | ||
HR | 11.01.2023 | ||
LT | 11.01.2023 | ||
LV | 11.01.2023 | ||
MC | 11.01.2023 | ||
NL | 11.01.2023 | ||
PL | 11.01.2023 | ||
RO | 11.01.2023 | ||
RS | 11.01.2023 | ||
SE | 11.01.2023 | ||
SM | 11.01.2023 | ||
NO | 11.04.2023 | ||
GR | 12.04.2023 | ||
IS | 11.05.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 11.01.2023 | |
DK | 11.01.2023 | ||
EE | 11.01.2023 | ||
FI | 11.01.2023 | ||
HR | 11.01.2023 | ||
LT | 11.01.2023 | ||
LV | 11.01.2023 | ||
MC | 11.01.2023 | ||
NL | 11.01.2023 | ||
PL | 11.01.2023 | ||
RS | 11.01.2023 | ||
SE | 11.01.2023 | ||
SM | 11.01.2023 | ||
NO | 11.04.2023 | ||
GR | 12.04.2023 | ||
IS | 11.05.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | AT | 11.01.2023 | |
DK | 11.01.2023 | ||
FI | 11.01.2023 | ||
HR | 11.01.2023 | ||
LT | 11.01.2023 | ||
LV | 11.01.2023 | ||
NL | 11.01.2023 | ||
PL | 11.01.2023 | ||
RS | 11.01.2023 | ||
SE | 11.01.2023 | ||
SM | 11.01.2023 | ||
NO | 11.04.2023 | ||
GR | 12.04.2023 | ||
IS | 11.05.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/39] | AT | 11.01.2023 | |
FI | 11.01.2023 | ||
HR | 11.01.2023 | ||
LT | 11.01.2023 | ||
LV | 11.01.2023 | ||
NL | 11.01.2023 | ||
PL | 11.01.2023 | ||
RS | 11.01.2023 | ||
SE | 11.01.2023 | ||
NO | 11.04.2023 | ||
GR | 12.04.2023 | ||
IS | 11.05.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AT | 11.01.2023 | |
FI | 11.01.2023 | ||
HR | 11.01.2023 | ||
LT | 11.01.2023 | ||
LV | 11.01.2023 | ||
NL | 11.01.2023 | ||
PL | 11.01.2023 | ||
RS | 11.01.2023 | ||
SE | 11.01.2023 | ||
NO | 11.04.2023 | ||
GR | 12.04.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AT | 11.01.2023 | |
FI | 11.01.2023 | ||
HR | 11.01.2023 | ||
LT | 11.01.2023 | ||
LV | 11.01.2023 | ||
NL | 11.01.2023 | ||
RS | 11.01.2023 | ||
SE | 11.01.2023 | ||
NO | 11.04.2023 | ||
GR | 12.04.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | AT | 11.01.2023 | |
FI | 11.01.2023 | ||
HR | 11.01.2023 | ||
LT | 11.01.2023 | ||
LV | 11.01.2023 | ||
NL | 11.01.2023 | ||
RS | 11.01.2023 | ||
SE | 11.01.2023 | ||
NO | 11.04.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 11.01.2023 | |
HR | 11.01.2023 | ||
LT | 11.01.2023 | ||
NL | 11.01.2023 | ||
RS | 11.01.2023 | ||
NO | 11.04.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | LT | 11.01.2023 | |
NL | 11.01.2023 | ||
RS | 11.01.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | LT | 11.01.2023 | |
NL | 11.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/31] | NL | 11.01.2023 | Cited in | International search | [I]WO2014159234 (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE], et al); | [A]WO2017106254 (MERCK SHARP & DOHME [US], et al); | [XP]WO2018109202 (JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA NV [BE]); | [XP]WO2018109198 (JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA NV [BE]); | [XP]WO2018154133 (JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA NV [BE]) | by applicant | US4938949 | WO2013075083 | WO2013075084 | WO2013078320 | WO2013120104 | WO2014124418 | WO2014151142 | WO2015023915 |