Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7239615B | Global Dossier | 14.03.2023 | B2 | JP2021530649 | 11.11.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2019EP57279 | 22.03.2019 | DE102018117366 | 18.07.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3824193 | Global Dossier | 26.05.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2019EP57279 | 22.03.2019 | DE102018117366 | 18.07.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2020015867 | Global Dossier | 23.01.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102018117366 | 18.07.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102018117366 | 28.03.2024 | B4 | DE102018117366 | 23.01.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102018117366 | 18.07.2018 |