EP3824193 - INSERT FOR CONNECTING AN ELECTRIC CONNECTION TO A WALL, DISASSEMBLY TOOL, AND ALIGNING TOOL FOR AN INSERT, AND METHOD FOR REPAIRING AN INSERT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.07.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.04.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.01.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 12.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fairchild Fasteners Europe - Camloc GmbH Industriestraße 6 65779 Kelkheim (Taunus) / DE | [2021/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DACH, Alexander Sebastian Wilhelmsplatz 1 99837 Berka/Werra / DE | 02 /
JÜLING, Dieter Schwarzwaldstraße 15G 65779 Kelkheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/21] | 01 /
DACH, Alexander Sebastian Ostendstr. 6a 65719 Hofheim / DE | ||
02 /
JÜLING, Dieter Schwarzwaldstraße 15G 65779 Kelkheim / DE | Representative(s) | Keil & Schaafhausen Patentanwälte PartGmbB Bockenheimer Landstraße 25 60325 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/21] | Keil & Schaafhausen Patentanwälte PartGmbB Friedrichstraße 2-6 60323 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 19714573.3 | 22.03.2019 | [2021/21] | WO2019EP57279 | Priority number, date | DE201810117366 | 18.07.2018 Original published format: DE102018117366 | [2021/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020015867 | Date: | 23.01.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3824193 | Date: | 26.05.2021 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.01.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | F16B3/06, B25B1/00, F16B35/06, H01R4/50, F16B1/00, B23P19/00, B25B27/00, B25B27/02, B25B27/06 | [2021/21] | CPC: |
F16B3/06 (EP);
B25B27/062 (EP);
B25B31/00 (EP);
F16B35/06 (EP);
H01R4/5025 (EP);
F16B2200/93 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/21] | Title | German: | EINSATZ ZUR VERBINDUNG EINES ELEKTRISCHEN ANSCHLUSSES MIT EINER WAND, DEMONTAGEWERKZEUG UND AUSRICHTUNGSWERKZEUG FÜR EINEN EINSATZ SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUR REPARATUR EINES EINSATZES | [2021/21] | English: | INSERT FOR CONNECTING AN ELECTRIC CONNECTION TO A WALL, DISASSEMBLY TOOL, AND ALIGNING TOOL FOR AN INSERT, AND METHOD FOR REPAIRING AN INSERT | [2021/21] | French: | INSERT SERVANT À RELIER UN RACCORDEMENT ÉLECTRIQUE À UNE PAROI, OUTIL DE DÉMONTAGE ET OUTIL D'ORIENTATION POUR UN INSERT AINSI QUE PROCÉDÉ DE RÉPARATION D'UN INSERT | [2021/21] | Entry into regional phase | 04.12.2020 | National basic fee paid | 04.12.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.12.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/21] | 04.12.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.08.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.07.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAYI]US5315745 (CANTWELL GILL [US], et al) [X] 8,10 * column 5, lines 42-61; figures 5, 6 * [A] 4 [Y] 15 [I] 9,13,14; | [XI]US6257939 (COURTOIS ALAIN [FR], et al) [X] 1-3,5-7 * column 1, line 5 - column 4, line 9; figures 1-6 * [I] 4; | [X]EP1376766 (DUBUIS ET CIE M [FR]) [X] 1,2 * paragraphs [0001] , [0 15] - [0039]; figures 1-5 *; | [XYI]EP2263826 (SHINJO MFG CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0034] - [0038]; figures 12-14 * [Y] 15[I] 11,12; | [X]CN103996908 (MEISHAN CSR FASTENER SCIENCE & TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0001] - [0049]; figures 1-3 *; | [X]WO2018011008 (FAIRCHILD FASTENERS EUROPE - CAMLOC GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,6 * page 1, lines 6-7; figures 1-4 * * page 7, line 13 - page 10, line 13 *; | [X]DE202018101358U (FAIRCHILD FASTENERS EUROPE CAMLOC GMBH [DE]) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0020] - [0032]; figures 1-3 * | by applicant | EP0880199 |