EP3775608 - TORSIONAL VIBRATION DAMPER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 01.12.2023 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.01.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.10.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 13.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.12.2023 | Withdrawal of application | published on 03.01.2024 [2024/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schaeffler Technologies AG & Co. KG Industriestrasse 1-3 91074 Herzogenaurach / DE | [2021/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KREMPER, Philippe 62, rue Saint Urbain 67100 Strasbourg / FR | 02 /
RUSCH, Alain 18 rue des Chanvriers 67760 Gambsheim / FR | 03 /
HÄSSLER, Martin Werderstraße 2 76676 Graben-Neudorf / DE | [2021/07] | Application number, filing date | 19714985.9 | 18.03.2019 | [2021/07] | WO2019DE100239 | Priority number, date | DE201810108414 | 10.04.2018 Original published format: DE102018108414 | [2021/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019196978 | Date: | 17.10.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3775608 | Date: | 17.02.2021 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.10.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | F16F15/12, F16F15/129, F16F15/131, F16F15/14 | [2021/07] | CPC: |
F16F15/1204 (EP,US);
F16F15/12353 (US);
F16F15/1292 (EP,US);
F16F15/13128 (EP);
F16D2121/14 (US);
F16D2200/0052 (US);
F16D2200/0056 (US);
F16D3/12 (US);
F16D3/14 (US);
F16D69/023 (US);
F16D69/026 (US);
F16F15/145 (EP);
F16F2222/04 (US);
F16F2224/0241 (US);
F16F2224/025 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/07] | Title | German: | DREHSCHWINGUNGSDÄMPFER | [2021/07] | English: | TORSIONAL VIBRATION DAMPER | [2021/07] | French: | AMORTISSEUR DE VIBRATIONS DE TORSION | [2021/07] | Entry into regional phase | 10.11.2020 | National basic fee paid | 10.11.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.11.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.11.2020 | Examination requested [2021/07] | 10.11.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.05.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.11.2023 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2024/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |