EP3773821 - STOPPER WITH LOW FORCE FOR USE IN AN INJECTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.05.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.01.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.10.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 16.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.09.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Injecto Group A/S Strandvejen 60 2900 Hellerup / DK | [2021/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HETTING, Mikael Strandvejen 251b 2920 Charlottenlund / DK | [2021/07] | Representative(s) | AWA Denmark A/S Strandgade 56 1401 Copenhagen K / DK | [2021/07] | Application number, filing date | 19715810.8 | 27.03.2019 | [2021/07] | WO2019DK50105 | Priority number, date | DK2018PA00135 | 27.03.2018 Original published format: DK PA201800135 | DK2018PA00637 | 24.09.2018 Original published format: DK PA201800637 | [2021/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019185101 | Date: | 03.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3773821 | Date: | 17.02.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.10.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/315 | [2021/07] | CPC: |
A61M5/31513 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61M5/3129 (IL,KR);
A61M5/31515 (EP,IL,KR);
A61M2005/3131 (IL,KR);
A61M2205/0216 (IL,KR);
A61M2205/0222 (EP,IL,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/07] | Title | German: | STOPPER MIT GERINGER KRAFT ZUR VERWENDUNG IN EINEM INJEKTOR | [2021/07] | English: | STOPPER WITH LOW FORCE FOR USE IN AN INJECTOR | [2021/07] | French: | BOUCHON À FAIBLE FORCE DESTINÉ À ÊTRE UTILISÉ DANS UN INJECTEUR | [2021/07] | Entry into regional phase | 07.10.2020 | National basic fee paid | 07.10.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.10.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.09.2019 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.10.2020 | Examination requested [2021/07] | 07.10.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.01.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.05.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.09.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [ID]WO2014194918 (MEDIJECT APS [DK]); | [I]WO2016039816 (SIO2 MEDICAL PRODUCTS INC [US]); | [ID]WO2017157396 (TINA HETTING HOLDING APS [DK]); | [I]US2018043102 (COJOCARIU GHEORGHE [US], et al) | by applicant | EP2703025 | WO2014194918 | WO2017157396 |