EP3948031 - JOINT, MOTOR, INDUSTRIAL ROBOT AND METHOD OF INSTALLING A SEAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.12.2023 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.01.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.10.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 16.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABB Schweiz AG Bruggerstrasse 66 5400 Baden / CH | [2022/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARTINI, Harald Föreningsgatan 12B 722 18 Västerås / SE | 02 /
ZHAO, Su Öster Mälarstrands Allé 136-1201 723 56 Västerås / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/06] | 01 /
MARTINI, Harald 722 18 Västerås / SE | ||
02 /
ZHAO, Su 723 56 Västerås / SE | Representative(s) | Kransell & Wennborg KB P.O. Box 27834 115 93 Stockholm / SE | [2022/06] | Application number, filing date | 19715867.8 | 29.03.2019 | [2022/06] | WO2019EP58031 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020200401 | Date: | 08.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3948031 | Date: | 09.02.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.10.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | F16J15/02, B25J19/00 | [2022/06] | CPC: |
F16J15/022 (EP,US);
B25J19/0075 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/06] | Title | German: | GELENK, MOTOR, INDUSTRIEROBOTER UND VERFAHREN ZUM EINBAU EINER DICHTUNG | [2022/06] | English: | JOINT, MOTOR, INDUSTRIAL ROBOT AND METHOD OF INSTALLING A SEAL | [2022/06] | French: | JOINT, MOTEUR, ROBOT INDUSTRIEL ET PROCÉDÉ D'INSTALLATION D'UN JOINT D'ÉTANCHÉITÉ | [2022/06] | Entry into regional phase | 01.10.2021 | National basic fee paid | 01.10.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.10.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/06] | 01.10.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 31.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.11.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.03.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9628683 (RAYCHEM SA NV [BE], et al) [X] 1-12,15* pages 6,4; figures 2-3 *; | [X]WO2013156851 (VANRX PHARMASYSTEMS INC [CA], et al) [X] 1-14 * figures 1-4 *; | [E]WO2019137605 (ABB SCHWEIZ AG [CH]) [E] 1-14 * figures 1-4 * |