Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Patent family: EP3769427 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201980031411 CN202410455258 EP19716038 US2019023302W US201917040131 US202217946200



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US11705926Global Dossier 18.07.2023B2
US2023022938 26.01.2023A1
Priority number Date
US202217946200 16.09.2022
US201862646480 22.03.2018
US202017040131 22.09.2020
WO2019US23302 21.03.2019
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US11476875Global Dossier 18.10.2022B2
US2021058100 25.02.2021A1
Priority number Date
US201862646480 22.03.2018
US201917040131 21.03.2019
WO2019US23302 21.03.2019
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN118449533Global Dossier 06.08.2024A
Priority number Date
CN201980031411 21.03.2019
US201862646480 22.03.2018
WO2019US23302 21.03.2019
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN112106302BGlobal Dossier 23.04.2024B
CN112106302 18.12.2020A
Priority number Date
US201862646480 22.03.2018
WO2019US23302 21.03.2019
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3769427Global Dossier 27.01.2021A1
Priority number Date
US201862646480 22.03.2018
WO2019US23302 21.03.2019
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2019183309Global Dossier 26.09.2019A1
Priority number Date
US201862646480 22.03.2018
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
TWI802668B 21.05.2023B
TW201947882 16.12.2019A
Priority number Date
US201862646480 22.03.2018