EP3947961 - A METHOD FOR ESTIMATING REMAINING USEFUL LIFE OF COMPONENTS OF AN OPERATIONAL WIND TURBINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.11.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.01.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.10.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 17.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Acciona Generación Renovable, S.A. Avda. Ciudad de la Innovación, 5 31621 Sarriguren (Navarra) / ES | For all designated states Sentient Science Corporation 672 Delaware Avenue Buffalo, NY 14209 / US | [2022/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RIBARIC, Adrijan 672 Delaware Avenue Buffalo, New York 14209 / US | 02 /
GALLEGO-CALDERON, Juan 672 Delaware Avenue Buffalo, New York 14209 / US | 03 /
IRUJO ESPINOSA DE MONTEROS, Mercedes Avda. Ciudad de la Innovación, nº 5 31621 Sarriguren (Navarra) / ES | [2023/23] |
Former [2022/06] | 01 /
RIBARIC, Adrijan Buffalo, New York 14209 / US | ||
02 /
GALLEGO-CALDERON, Juan Buffalo, New York 14209 / US | |||
03 /
IRUJO ESPINOSA DE MONTEROS, Mercedes 31621 Sarriguren (Navarra) / ES | Representative(s) | Pons Glorieta Rubén Darío 4 28010 Madrid / ES | [2022/06] | Application number, filing date | 19716106.0 | 01.04.2019 | [2022/06] | WO2019EP58207 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020200421 | Date: | 08.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3947961 | Date: | 09.02.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.10.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3947961 | Date: | 07.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | F03D7/02, F03D17/00 | [2022/06] | CPC: |
F03D7/0292 (EP,US);
F03D17/00 (EP,US);
F05B2260/84 (EP,US);
F05B2270/332 (EP,US);
Y02E10/72 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | TN | 26.10.2021 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR SCHÄTZUNG DER VERBLEIBENDEN NUTZUNGSDAUER VON KOMPONENTEN EINER FUNKTIONIERENDEN WINDTURBINE | [2022/06] | English: | A METHOD FOR ESTIMATING REMAINING USEFUL LIFE OF COMPONENTS OF AN OPERATIONAL WIND TURBINE | [2022/06] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR ESTIMER LA DURÉE DE VIE UTILE RESTANTE DE COMPOSANTS D'UNE TURBINE ÉOLIENNE FONCTIONNELLE | [2022/06] | Entry into regional phase | 26.10.2021 | National basic fee paid | 26.10.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.10.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.02.2021 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/06] | 26.10.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.11.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.03.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 09.03.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.03.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 08.03.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.06.2023 | CZ | 07.06.2023 | DK | 07.06.2023 | EE | 07.06.2023 | FI | 07.06.2023 | LT | 07.06.2023 | LV | 07.06.2023 | NL | 07.06.2023 | RO | 07.06.2023 | RS | 07.06.2023 | SE | 07.06.2023 | SI | 07.06.2023 | SK | 07.06.2023 | SM | 07.06.2023 | NO | 07.09.2023 | GR | 08.09.2023 | IS | 07.10.2023 | HR | 20.12.2023 | [2024/25] |
Former [2024/22] | AT | 07.06.2023 | |
CZ | 07.06.2023 | ||
DK | 07.06.2023 | ||
EE | 07.06.2023 | ||
FI | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
NL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RO | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
HR | 20.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 07.06.2023 | |
CZ | 07.06.2023 | ||
EE | 07.06.2023 | ||
FI | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
NL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RO | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
HR | 20.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 07.06.2023 | |
CZ | 07.06.2023 | ||
FI | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
NL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | FI | 07.06.2023 | |
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
NL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | FI | 07.06.2023 | |
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
NL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | LT | 07.06.2023 | |
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
NL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/52] | NL | 07.06.2023 | |
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | RS | 07.06.2023 | |
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | SE | 07.06.2023 | |
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | SE | 07.06.2023 | |
NO | 07.09.2023 | Cited in | International search | [I]US2014088887 (POON ANDY [GB], et al) [I] 1-18 * paragraphs [0008] , [0011] , [0012] , [0015] , [0016] , [0051] , [0052] , [0063] , [0068] , [0087]; figure 1 *; | [I]KR101706508B (KOREA ENERGY RESEARCH INST [KR]) [I] 1-18 * paragraphs [0027] , [0035] , [0095] , [0105] - [0111] *; | [A]US2018142674 (HAMMERUM KELD [DK], et al) [A] 1-18* the whole document * | by applicant | EP2290597 | US2016010628 |