EP3773447 - OPAQUE COMPOSITION CONTAINING ETHYLENE GLYCOL DISTEARATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 31.05.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.02.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.01.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.10.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 17.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Evonik Operations GmbH Rellinghauser Straße 1-11 45128 Essen / DE | [2021/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHWAB, Peter Frankenstrasse 222 45134 Essen / DE | 02 /
SCHUCH, Dominik Hammer Dorfstr. 137 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | 03 /
WINTER, Patrick Peisberg 27 45473 Mülheim an der Ruhr / DE | 04 /
MUSS, Peter An der Seilbahn 18 45359 Essen / DE | [2021/07] | Representative(s) | Evonik Patent Association c/o Evonik Industries AG IP Management Bau 1042A/PB 15 Paul-Baumann-Straße 1 45772 Marl / DE | [2021/07] | Application number, filing date | 19716198.7 | 12.04.2019 | [2021/07] | WO2019EP59463 | Priority number, date | EP20180167225 | 13.04.2018 Original published format: EP 18167225 | [2021/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019197626 | Date: | 17.10.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3773447 | Date: | 17.02.2021 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.10.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3773447 | Date: | 03.07.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/37, A61K8/46, A61K8/36, A61K8/86, A61Q5/02, A61Q19/10 | [2021/07] | CPC: |
A61K8/37 (EP);
A61K8/375 (US);
A61K8/463 (EP,US);
A61K8/86 (EP);
A61Q19/10 (EP,US);
A61Q5/02 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | OPAKE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ENTHALTEND ETHYLENGLYKOLDISTEARAT | [2021/07] | English: | OPAQUE COMPOSITION CONTAINING ETHYLENE GLYCOL DISTEARATE | [2021/07] | French: | COMPOSITION OPAQUE CONTENANT DE DISTÉARATE D'ÉTHYLÈNE GLYCOL | [2024/04] |
Former [2021/07] | COMPOSITION OPAQUE CONTENANT DU DISTÉARATE D'ÉTHYLÈNE GLYCOL | Entry into regional phase | 07.09.2020 | National basic fee paid | 07.09.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.09.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.09.2020 | Examination requested [2021/07] | 07.09.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.05.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.05.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 28.05.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.05.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0568848 (HOECHST AG [DE]); | [X]DE19801231 (HENKEL KGAA [DE], et al); | [X]JP2003055165 (RHODIA NICCA LTD); | [A]US2004037793 (NIEENDICK CLAUS [DE], et al) | by applicant | CN192816613 | JP2003055165 |