EP3941806 - FIFTH WHEEL CONTROL ARRANGEMENTS FOR ARTICULATED VEHICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.10.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.12.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.09.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 19.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VOLVO TRUCK CORPORATION 405 08 Göteborg / SE | [2022/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SÖDER, Richard Skräddarns väg 21 449 36 Nödinge / SE | 02 /
JOHANSSON, Lars Lillbackagård 511 99 Sätila / SE | 03 /
JOHANSSON, Olof Torpa 370 446 96 Hålanda / SE | [2023/14] |
Former [2022/04] | 01 /
SÖDER, Richard 449 35 Nödinge / SE | ||
02 /
JOHANSSON, Lars 511 99 Sätila / SE | |||
03 /
JOHANSSON, Olof 446 96 Hålanda / SE | Representative(s) | Zacco Sweden AB P.O. Box 5581 Löjtnantsgatan 21 114 85 Stockholm / SE | [2023/23] |
Former [2022/04] | Zacco Sweden AB P.O. Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 19716305.8 | 20.03.2019 | [2022/04] | WO2019EP56931 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020187406 | Date: | 24.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3941806 | Date: | 26.01.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.09.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3941806 | Date: | 07.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.09.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B62D53/08, B62D53/06 | [2022/04] | CPC: |
B62D53/0807 (EP);
B62D53/068 (EP,US);
B62D53/0835 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/04] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SATTELKUPPLUNGSSTEUERANORDNUNGEN FÜR GELENKFAHRZEUGE | [2022/04] | English: | FIFTH WHEEL CONTROL ARRANGEMENTS FOR ARTICULATED VEHICLES | [2022/04] | French: | AGENCEMENTS DE COMMANDE DE CINQUIÈME ROUE POUR VÉHICULES ARTICULÉS | [2022/04] | Entry into regional phase | 20.10.2021 | National basic fee paid | 20.10.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.10.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/04] | 20.10.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.10.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.02.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 24.02.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.02.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 08.03.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 07.06.2023 | ES | 07.06.2023 | HR | 07.06.2023 | PL | 07.06.2023 | RO | 07.06.2023 | RS | 07.06.2023 | SK | 07.06.2023 | SM | 07.06.2023 | NO | 07.09.2023 | GR | 08.09.2023 | IS | 07.10.2023 | [2024/10] |
Former [2024/09] | CZ | 07.06.2023 | |
ES | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 07.06.2023 | Cited in | International search | [AD]US2847230 (HENDRICKSON JOHN V, et al) [AD] 1-18 * column 2, line 5 - column 4, line 37; figures 1-5 *; | [A]US3035855 (HARRIS BERT C) [A] 1-18 * column 2, line 33 - column 3, line 15; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US3092399 (HAIR BENJAMIN F) [A] 1-18 * column 1, line 50 - column 3, line 58; figures 1-4 *; | [A]EP0512862 (FEROZ S L [ES]) [A] 1-18 * column 2, line 35 - column 8, line 23; figures 1-12 *; | [A]GB2372490 (MULTIDRIVE LTD [GB]) [A] 1-18 * page 2, paragraph 2 - page 5, paragraph 1; figures 1-6 *; | [A]EP2258586 (BERMES MANFRED [DE], et al) [A] 1-18* paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0021]; figures 1-3 * | by applicant | US2847230 |