01.03.2024 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 03.04.2024 [2024/14] |
23.02.2024 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
23.02.2024 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
23.02.2024 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
16.02.2024 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.10.2023 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
29.09.2023 |
Change - classification |
published on 01.11.2023 [2023/44] |
29.09.2023 |
Change - classification |
published on 01.11.2023 [2023/44] |
01.09.2023 |
Change - inventor |
published on 04.10.2023 [2023/40] |
15.02.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.09.2022 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
20.05.2022 |
First examination report |
|
19.05.2022 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
16.02.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.06.2021 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 14.07.2021 [2021/28] |
11.06.2021 |
Change - extension states |
published on 14.07.2021 [2021/28] |
25.05.2021 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
15.03.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.01.2021 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 17.02.2021 [2021/07] |
15.01.2021 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
15.01.2021 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 17.02.2021 [2021/07] |
15.12.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.12.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.11.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.06.2020 |
New entry: applicant or inventor |
|
02.12.2019 |
Change - representative |
|
02.12.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.10.2019 |
New entry: applicant or inventor |
|
12.10.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.10.2019 |
New entry: applicant or inventor |
|
19.04.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|