EP3796843 - SYSTEM TO IMPROVE NUCLEAR IMAGE OF MOVING VOLUME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.02.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.10.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.02.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.01.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 19.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR, HR, RS | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Medical Solutions USA, Inc. 40 Liberty Blvd. Malvern, PA 19355 / US | [2021/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SPOTTISWOODE, Bruce S. 13013 Peach View Drive Knoxville, Tennessee 37922 / US | 02 /
SOLDNER, Juergen 615 Witherspoon Lane Knoxville, Tennessee 37934 / US | [2021/13] | Representative(s) | Horn Kleimann Waitzhofer Schmid-Dreyer Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Theresienhöhe 12 80339 München / DE | [2024/12] |
Former [2021/13] | Horn Kleimann Waitzhofer Patentanwälte PartG mbB Ganghoferstrasse 29a 80339 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19716729.9 | 27.03.2019 | [2021/13] | WO2019US24233 | Priority number, date | US201816021264 | 28.06.2018 Original published format: US201816021264 | [2021/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020005351 | Date: | 02.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3796843 | Date: | 31.03.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.01.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3796843 | Date: | 20.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61B6/03, A61B6/00 | [2021/13] | CPC: |
A61B6/032 (EP);
A61B6/5264 (EP,US);
A61B6/037 (EP,US);
A61B6/5205 (EP);
A61B6/5235 (EP,US);
A61B6/5288 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/13] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR VERBESSERUNG EINES NUKLEAR-MEDIZINISCHEN BILDES EINES SICH BEWEGENDEN VOLUMENS | [2023/43] | English: | SYSTEM TO IMPROVE NUCLEAR IMAGE OF MOVING VOLUME | [2021/13] | French: | SYSTÈME POUR AMÉLIORER L'IMAGE NUCLÉAIRE D'UN VOLUME MOBILE | [2021/13] |
Former [2021/13] | SYSTEM ZUR VERBESSERUNG DES KERNBILDES EINES SICH BEWEGENDEN VOLUMENS | Entry into regional phase | 22.12.2020 | National basic fee paid | 22.12.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.12.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/13] | 22.12.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.05.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.02.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 09.02.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.02.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HR | 20.03.2024 | NO | 20.06.2024 | RS | 20.06.2024 | GR | 21.06.2024 | [2024/34] |
Former [2024/33] | NO | 20.06.2024 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2009253980 (WOLLENWEBER SCOTT DAVID [US], et al) [A] 1-7,15-20 * abstract * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0046] * * figure 3 *; | [A] - NEHMEH S A ET AL, "Respiratory Motion in Positron Emission Tomography/Computed Tomography: A Review", SEMINARS IN NUCLEAR MEDICINE, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 38, no. 3, doi:10.1053/J.SEMNUCLMED.2008.01.002, ISSN 0001-2998, (20080501), pages 167 - 176, (20080404), XP022585220 [A] 1-7,15-20 * abstract * * section "Respiratory Motion Artifacts" * * section "Respiratory Motion Correction" * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1053/j.semnuclmed.2008.01.002 | [A] - Sadek A Nehmeh ET AL, "Deep-Inspiration Breath-Hold PET/CT of the Thorax", The Journal of Nuclear Medicine, United States, (20070101), pages 22 - 26, URL: http://jnm.snmjournals.org/content/48/1/22.full.pdf, XP055464765 [A] 1-7,15-20 * abstract * * section "Materials and Methods" * | [A] - PAUL B SHYN ET AL, "Minimizing Image Misregistration during PET/CT guided Percutaneous Interventions with Monitored Breath-hold PET and CT Acquisitions", JOURNAL OF VASCULAR AND INTERVENTIONAL RADIOLOGY, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 22, no. 9, doi:10.1016/J.JVIR.2011.06.015, ISSN 1051-0443, (20110622), pages 1287 - 1292, (20110628), XP028268458 [A] 1-7,15-20 * abstract * * section "Materials and Methods" * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jvir.2011.06.015 |