EP3762009 - TOXIN-DERIVED DELIVERY CONSTRUCTS FOR ORAL DELIVERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.03.2023 Database last updated on 26.04.2025 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.04.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.11.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.05.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.12.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.09.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 19.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2024 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): BG | published on 18.12.2024 [2024/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Applied Molecular Transport Inc. 450 East Jamie Court South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | [2022/17] |
Former [2021/02] | For all designated states Applied Molecular Transport Inc. 1 Tower Place, Suite 850 South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MRSNY, Randall J. 1 Tower Place, Suite 850 South San Francisco, California 94080 / US | 02 /
LIU, Keyi 1 Tower Place, Suite 850 South San Francisco, California 94080 / US | 03 /
MACKAY, Julia Dawn 1 Tower Place, Suite 850 South San Francisco, California 94080 / US | 04 /
FENG, Weijun 1 Tower Place, Suite 850 South San Francisco, California 94080 / US | 05 /
HUNTER, Thomas Carl 1 Tower Place, Suite 850 South San Francisco, California 94080 / US | 06 /
MAHMOOD, Tahir 1 Tower Place, Suite 850 South San Francisco, California 94080 / US | 07 /
TAVERNER, Alistair 1 Tower Place, Suite 850 South San Francisco, California 94080 / US | [2021/29] |
Former [2021/02] | 01 /
MRSNY, Randall J. 1 Tower Place, Suite 850 South San Francisco, California 94080 / US | ||
02 /
LIU, Keyi 1 Tower Place, Suite 850 South San Francisco, California 94080 / US | |||
03 /
MACKAY, Julia Dawn 1 Tower Place, Suite 850 South San Francisco, California 94080 / US | |||
04 /
FENG, Weijun 1 Tower Place, Suite 850 South San Francisco, California 94080 / US | |||
05 /
HUNTER, Thomas Carl 1 Tower Place, Suite 850 South San Francisco, California 94080 / US | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2022/19] |
Former [2021/02] | Marshall, Cameron John Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 19717013.7 | 08.03.2019 | [2021/02] | WO2019US21474 | Priority number, date | US201862640188P | 08.03.2018 Original published format: US 201862640188 P | US201862640194P | 08.03.2018 Original published format: US 201862640194 P | US201862640168P | 08.03.2018 Original published format: US 201862640168 P | US201862756889P | 07.11.2018 Original published format: US 201862756889 P | [2021/32] |
Former [2021/02] | US201862640188P | 08.03.2018 | |
US201862640194P | 08.03.2018 | ||
US201862640168P | 08.03.2018 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019173787 | Date: | 12.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3762009 | Date: | 13.01.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3762009 | Date: | 11.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.09.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C12N9/10, C07K14/21, C07K14/28, A61K38/00, A61K38/16, A61K47/64, A61K47/65 | [2021/49] | CPC: |
A61K38/21 (EP,US);
C07K14/28 (EP,IL,KR);
A61K47/64 (KR);
A61K47/6415 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,IL);
A61K38/19 (KR);
A61K38/27 (US);
A61K47/65 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K9/0043 (EP,US);
A61K9/007 (US);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P1/16 (KR);
A61P29/00 (KR);
A61P3/00 (KR);
A61P35/00 (KR);
A61P37/00 (KR);
C07K14/21 (EP,IL,KR);
C07K14/5428 (KR);
C07K14/62 (KR);
C07K16/241 (KR);
C12N9/1077 (EP,IL);
C12Y204/02036 (EP,IL);
A61K2039/505 (KR);
A61K9/0053 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2021/02] | A61K38/16, C07K14/21, C07K14/28, A61K47/64, C12N9/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/02] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VON TOXINEN ABGELEITETE KONSTRUKTE ZUR ORALEN VERABREICHUNG | [2021/02] | English: | TOXIN-DERIVED DELIVERY CONSTRUCTS FOR ORAL DELIVERY | [2021/02] | French: | CONSTRUCTIONS D'ADMINISTRATION DÉRIVÉES DE TOXINES POUR ADMINISTRATION ORALE | [2021/02] | Entry into regional phase | 08.10.2020 | National basic fee paid | 08.10.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.10.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.10.2020 | Examination requested [2021/02] | 08.10.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.02.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.05.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.09.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.11.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.04.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 04.04.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.04.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP22165874.3 / EP4082558 | EP23192492.9 / EP4316586 | Opposition(s) | 14.02.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 11.05.2022 | BG | 11.05.2022 | EE | 11.05.2022 | HR | 11.05.2022 | LT | 11.05.2022 | LV | 11.05.2022 | MC | 11.05.2022 | RO | 11.05.2022 | RS | 11.05.2022 | SM | 11.05.2022 | IS | 11.09.2022 | [2024/51] |
Former [2023/48] | AL | 11.05.2022 | |
EE | 11.05.2022 | ||
HR | 11.05.2022 | ||
LT | 11.05.2022 | ||
LV | 11.05.2022 | ||
MC | 11.05.2022 | ||
RO | 11.05.2022 | ||
RS | 11.05.2022 | ||
SM | 11.05.2022 | ||
BG | 11.08.2022 | ||
IS | 11.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 11.05.2022 | |
EE | 11.05.2022 | ||
HR | 11.05.2022 | ||
LT | 11.05.2022 | ||
LV | 11.05.2022 | ||
RO | 11.05.2022 | ||
RS | 11.05.2022 | ||
SM | 11.05.2022 | ||
BG | 11.08.2022 | ||
IS | 11.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | EE | 11.05.2022 | |
HR | 11.05.2022 | ||
LT | 11.05.2022 | ||
LV | 11.05.2022 | ||
RO | 11.05.2022 | ||
RS | 11.05.2022 | ||
SM | 11.05.2022 | ||
BG | 11.08.2022 | ||
IS | 11.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/51] | HR | 11.05.2022 | |
LT | 11.05.2022 | ||
LV | 11.05.2022 | ||
RS | 11.05.2022 | ||
BG | 11.08.2022 | ||
IS | 11.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | HR | 11.05.2022 | |
LT | 11.05.2022 | ||
LV | 11.05.2022 | ||
RS | 11.05.2022 | ||
BG | 11.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | HR | 11.05.2022 | |
LT | 11.05.2022 | ||
LV | 11.05.2022 | ||
BG | 11.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | LT | 11.05.2022 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2012036746 (MRSNY RANDALL J [US], et al); | [XI]WO2015171965 (APPLIED MOLECULAR TRANSP LLC [US]); | by applicant | US4414148 | US4458066 | US4569789 | US4589071 | US4659839 | US4671958 | US4680338 | US4683195 | US4699784 | US5272065 | US5807832 | US5917021 | US5922680 | US5997856 | US6007791 | US6086918 | US6133229 | US6174529 | US6255284 | US6391296 | US6525102 | US6573237 | US6592847 | US6613332 | US6673574 | US6759207 | US8877161 | WO2014US56177 |