EP3762302 - THE HANDLE PACKAGE AND THE PACKAGING PROCEDURE FOR THE KINDLING WOOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.09.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.12.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.09.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 24.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.2024 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Makic, Drago Generala Save Grujica 9A 11000 Beograd / RS | For all designated states Makic, Ninoslav Generala Save Grujica 9A 11000 Beograd / RS | [2021/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2021/02] | Representative(s) | Dennemeyer & Associates S.A. Postfach 70 04 25 81304 München / DE | [2021/02] | Application number, filing date | 19717203.4 | 22.02.2019 | [2021/02] | WO2019RS00009 | Priority number, date | RS2018P000293 | 09.03.2018 Original published format: RS P20180293 | [2021/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019172795 | Date: | 12.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3762302 | Date: | 13.01.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.09.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B65D5/46, B65D61/00, B65D65/46 | [2021/02] | CPC: |
B65D61/00 (EP);
B65D5/46008 (EP);
B65D65/466 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/02] | Extension states | BA | 19.08.2020 | Title | German: | GRIFFVERPACKUNG UND VERPACKUNGSVERFAHREN ZUM VERPACKEN VON ANZÜNDHOLZ | [2021/02] | English: | THE HANDLE PACKAGE AND THE PACKAGING PROCEDURE FOR THE KINDLING WOOD | [2021/02] | French: | EMBALLAGE À POIGNÉE ET TECHNIQUE DE CONDITIONNEMENT DU BOIS D'ALLUMAGE | [2021/02] | Entry into regional phase | 19.08.2020 | National basic fee paid | 19.08.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.08.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.08.2020 | Examination requested [2021/02] | 20.08.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.02.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.09.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.12.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.09.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2024 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]GB191007399 (GLOVER ARTHUR WILLIAM) [A] 1-8* page 2, line 41 - page 3, line 23; figures 1-10; claims 1-4 *; | [A]US4072094 (SMITHERMAN STEPHEN N, et al) [A] 1-8 * column 2, line 67 - column 8, line 28; figures 1-11; claims 1-12 *; | [XA]WO2006007616 (WALDERDORFF JOSEF LEO [AT]) [X] 1,2 * page 3, line 26 - page 4, line 14 * * page 6, line 11 - line 24; figures 1,2; claims 1-8,10,13,18 * [A] 3-5; | [Y]FR2877649 (STUDIOPACK SARL [FR]) [Y] 1,2 * page 7, line 6 - page 8, line 14; figures 1-5; claims 1-6 *; | [Y]US2009159073 (GIORDANO GABRIEL [US]) [Y] 1,2 * paragraph [0012]; figure 1; claims 1,4 * | by applicant | ES314257 | DE102007050004 | EP2796377 |