EP3784403 - JAW CRUSHER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.08.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.06.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.01.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.11.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 29.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KLEEMANN GMBH Manfred-Wörner-Str. 160 73037 Göppingen / DE | [2021/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MEIER, Jochen Karlstraße 9 72584 Hülben / DE | 02 /
KRAUSS, Till Im Wiesengrund 9 73098 Rechberghausen / DE | [2024/36] |
Former [2021/09] | 01 /
MEIER, Jochen Karlstraße 9 72584 Hülben / DE | ||
02 /
KRAUSS, Till Hornbergstr. 36 73035 Göppingen-Faurndau / DE | Representative(s) | Herrmann, Jochen Patentanwalt European Patent Attorney Königstrasse 30 70173 Stuttgart / DE | [2021/09] | Application number, filing date | 19718120.9 | 11.04.2019 | [2021/09] | WO2019EP59216 | Priority number, date | DE201810110265 | 27.04.2018 Original published format: DE102018110265 | [2021/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019206654 | Date: | 31.10.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3784403 | Date: | 03.03.2021 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.10.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3784403 | Date: | 04.09.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B02C1/02 | [2021/09] | CPC: |
B02C1/025 (EP,US);
B02C1/04 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/09] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BACKENBRECHER | [2021/09] | English: | JAW CRUSHER | [2021/09] | French: | CONCASSEUR À MACHOIRES | [2024/28] |
Former [2021/09] | CONCASSEUR À MÂCHOIRES | Entry into regional phase | 27.11.2020 | National basic fee paid | 27.11.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.11.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.11.2020 | Examination requested [2021/09] | 27.11.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 31.05.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.06.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.07.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 26.07.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.07.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]JP2006247602 (HITACHI CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY); | [YA]EP2135677 (CHYI MEANG MACHINERY CO LTD [TW]); | [Y]DE102013210016 (TEREX GB LTD [GB]); | [Y]DE102015118398 (DESCH ANTRIEBSTECHNIK GMBH & CO KG [DE]); | [Y]KR101685177B (SAMYOUNG PLANT CO LTD [KR]) | by applicant | EP2662142 |