EP3781509 - TELESCOPIC HOLDER FOR MOVING CONTAINERS IN HIGH-BAY WAREHOUSES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.04.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.01.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.10.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 29.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2024 | Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AMOVA GmbH Obere Industriestraße 8 57250 Netphen / DE | [2021/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOFMANN, Karl Robert Zum Rademächen 11 57250 Netphen / DE | [2021/08] | Representative(s) | Kross, Ulrich Sankt-Michael-Straße 2 57072 Siegen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/08] | Grosse, Wolf-Dietrich Rüdiger Gihske Grosse Klüppel Kross Bürogemeinschaft von Patentanwälten Hammerstrasse 3 57072 Siegen / DE | Application number, filing date | 19718164.7 | 16.04.2019 | [2021/08] | WO2019EP59762 | Priority number, date | DE201810205933 | 18.04.2018 Original published format: DE102018205933 | [2021/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019201896 | Date: | 24.10.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3781509 | Date: | 24.02.2021 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.10.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B66C1/66, B66F9/07, B65G1/04 | [2021/08] | CPC: |
B65G1/0407 (EP,IL,KR,US);
B66C1/663 (EP,IL,KR,US);
B66F9/14 (US);
B66F9/07 (EP,IL,KR,US);
B66F2700/09 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/08] | Title | German: | TELESKOPAUFNAHME ZUM VERLAGERN VON CONTAINERN IN HOCHREGALLAGERN | [2021/08] | English: | TELESCOPIC HOLDER FOR MOVING CONTAINERS IN HIGH-BAY WAREHOUSES | [2021/08] | French: | DISPOSITIF TÉLESCOPIQUE DE RÉCEPTION SERVANT À DÉPLACER DES CONTENEURS DANS DES MAGASINS DE GRANDE HAUTEUR | [2021/08] | Entry into regional phase | 13.10.2020 | National basic fee paid | 13.10.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.10.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.02.2020 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.10.2020 | Examination requested [2021/08] | 13.10.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.04.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2022 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   27.09.2022 | 30.04.2023 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   25.09.2023 | 30.04.2024 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]GB1205499 (HUTSONS LTD, et al); | [A]US3677599 (SHANNON JAMES WILLIAM); | [X]DE19539914 (NOELL GMBH [DE]); | [XI]DE9321200U (PREUSSAG NOELL GMBH [DE]); | [Y]US2004126211 (BARRY LEONARD D [US]); | [Y]WO2013175063 (OY LANGH SHIP AB [FI]); | [Y]WO2015124342 (SMS LOGISTIKSYSTEME GMBH [DE]); | [XI]WO2017135851 (ELME SPREADER AB [SE]) | by applicant | DE9321200U | EP1272414 | DE102008007860 | WO2015124342 |