EP3759367 - LARGE ROLLING BEARING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.09.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.10.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.06.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.06.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.12.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.10.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 01.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.10.2024 [2024/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Liebherr-Components Biberach GmbH Hans-Liebherr-Strasse 45 88400 Biberach/Riss / DE | [2021/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALTMAYER, Thomas Biberacher Str. 102 88441 Mittelbiberach / DE | 02 /
BORN, Oliver Tiroler Str. 35 89281 Altenstadt / DE | 03 /
PALMER, Andreas Johannes-Wagner-Str. 11 88499 Riedlingen / DE | [2021/01] | Representative(s) | Thoma, Michael Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstraße 23 80538 München / DE | [2021/01] | Application number, filing date | 19718605.9 | 09.04.2019 | [2021/01] | WO2019EP58887 | Priority number, date | DE201820102121U | 17.04.2018 Original published format: DE 202018102121 U | [2021/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019201662 | Date: | 24.10.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3759367 | Date: | 06.01.2021 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.10.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3759367 | Date: | 15.11.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | F16C19/08, F16C19/18, F16C19/28, F16C19/38, F16C19/56 | [2023/22] | CPC: |
F16C33/6696 (EP,US);
F16C19/08 (EP);
F16C19/18 (EP);
F16C19/28 (EP);
F16C19/38 (EP);
F16C19/381 (US);
F16C19/56 (EP);
F16C33/58 (US);
F16C33/6611 (EP,US);
F16C33/6614 (EP,US);
F16C33/6648 (EP,US);
F16C33/6651 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2021/01] | F16C33/66 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GROSSWÄLZLAGER | [2023/22] | English: | LARGE ROLLING BEARING | [2021/01] | French: | PALIER À ROULEMENT DE GRANDE DIMENSION | [2021/01] |
Former [2021/01] | GROßWÄLZLAGER | Entry into regional phase | 30.09.2020 | National basic fee paid | 30.09.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.09.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.09.2020 | Examination requested [2021/01] | 30.09.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.04.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.10.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.04.2022 | Observations by third parties | 20.10.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.02.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.09.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 29.09.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.09.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 19.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 15.11.2023 | EE | 15.11.2023 | HR | 15.11.2023 | IT | 15.11.2023 | LT | 15.11.2023 | LV | 15.11.2023 | NL | 15.11.2023 | PL | 15.11.2023 | RO | 15.11.2023 | RS | 15.11.2023 | SE | 15.11.2023 | SK | 15.11.2023 | SM | 15.11.2023 | BG | 15.02.2024 | NO | 15.02.2024 | GR | 16.02.2024 | IS | 15.03.2024 | PT | 15.03.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | CZ | 15.11.2023 | |
EE | 15.11.2023 | ||
HR | 15.11.2023 | ||
LT | 15.11.2023 | ||
LV | 15.11.2023 | ||
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
PL | 15.11.2023 | ||
RO | 15.11.2023 | ||
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
SE | 15.11.2023 | ||
SM | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
NO | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
PT | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | EE | 15.11.2023 | |
HR | 15.11.2023 | ||
LT | 15.11.2023 | ||
LV | 15.11.2023 | ||
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
PL | 15.11.2023 | ||
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
SE | 15.11.2023 | ||
SM | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
NO | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
PT | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | HR | 15.11.2023 | |
LT | 15.11.2023 | ||
LV | 15.11.2023 | ||
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
PL | 15.11.2023 | ||
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
SE | 15.11.2023 | ||
SM | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
NO | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
PT | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | HR | 15.11.2023 | |
LT | 15.11.2023 | ||
LV | 15.11.2023 | ||
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
PL | 15.11.2023 | ||
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
SE | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
NO | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
PT | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | HR | 15.11.2023 | |
LT | 15.11.2023 | ||
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
PL | 15.11.2023 | ||
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
SE | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
NO | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
PT | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 15.11.2023 | |
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 16.02.2024 | |
IS | 15.03.2024 | Cited in | International search | [XI]JP2003214446 (HITACHI CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY); | [XI]JP2003222140 (HITACHI CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY, et al); | [XI]JP2006022851 (HITACHI CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY); | [XI]DE102014104599 (THYSSENKRUPP AG [DE], et al); | [XI]US2017370406 (TRAN ANH [US]) | Examination | DE102010051968 | US2014197006 | EP2762737 | DE202016003040U | by applicant | WO2008088213 | EP2092204 |