EP3774760 - PLADIENOLIDE DERIVATIVES AS SPLICEOSOME TARGETING AGENTS FOR TREATING CANCER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.12.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.12.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 31.07.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.03.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.01.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.12.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.01.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.10.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 03.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2024 | New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eisai R&D Management Co., Ltd. 6-10, Koishikawa 4-chome, Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 112-8088 / JP | [2021/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COOK, Andrew 9 October Lane Stow, Massachusetts 01772 / US | 02 /
LOWE, Jason T. 30 Pine Wood Path East Bridgewater, Massachusetts 02333 / US | 03 /
PRAJAPATI, Sudeep 4 Partridge Avenue Somerville, Massachusetts 02145 / US | 04 /
SAMARAKOON, Thiwanka 153 High Street Westwood, Massachusetts 02090 / US | 05 /
BRAWN, Ryan 19 Burnham Street Sudbury, Massachusetts 01776 / US | 06 /
REYNOLDS, Dominic 28 Bonad Road Stoneham, Massachusetts 02180 / US | 07 /
ZHONG, Cheng 19 Burnham Street Belmont, Massachusetts 02478 / US | 08 /
ELLERY, Shelby 1 Canal Street, Unit 422 Boston, Massachusetts 02114 / US | 09 /
LIU, Xiang 10 Marion Street Winchester, Massachusetts 01890 / US | 10 /
SHEEHAN, Megan 65 Brainerd Road, Apt. 309 Allston, Massachusetts 02134 / US | 11 /
PALACINO, James 21 Beechwood Road Wellesley, Massachusetts 02482 / US | [2021/11] |
Former [2021/07] | 01 /
COOK, Andrew 9 October Lane Stow, Massachusetts 01772 / US | ||
02 /
LOWE, Jason T. 30 Pine Wood Path East Bridgewater, Massachusetts 02333 / US | |||
03 /
PRAJAPATI, Sudeep 270 Highland Avenue, Apt. 53 Somerville, Massachusetts 02143 / US | |||
04 /
SAMARAKOON, Thiwanka 153 High Street Westwood, Massachusetts 02090 / US | |||
05 /
BRAWN, Ryan 19 Burnham Street Sudbury, Massachusetts 01776 / US | |||
06 /
REYNOLDS, Dominic 28 Bonad Road Stoneham, Massachusetts 02180 / US | |||
07 /
ZHONG, Cheng 19 Burnham Street Belmont, Massachusetts 02478 / US | |||
08 /
ELLERY, Shelby 1 Canal Street, Unit 422 Boston, Massachusetts 02114 / US | |||
09 /
LIU, Xiang 10 Marion Street Winchester, Massachusetts 01890 / US | |||
10 /
SHEEHAN, Megan 65 Brainerd Road, Apt. 309 Allston, Massachusetts 02134 / US | |||
11 /
PALACINO, James 21 Beechwood Road Wellesley, Massachusetts 02482 / US | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2021/07] | Application number, filing date | 19719150.5 | 11.04.2019 | [2021/07] | WO2019US26992 | Priority number, date | US201862656865P | 12.04.2018 Original published format: US 201862656865 P | US201862679658P | 01.06.2018 Original published format: US 201862679658 P | US201962814824P | 06.03.2019 Original published format: US 201962814824 P | US201962814828P | 06.03.2019 Original published format: US 201962814828 P | [2021/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019200100 | Date: | 17.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3774760 | Date: | 17.02.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.10.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C07D313/00, C07D405/06, C07D405/10, C07D405/14, C07D498/08, C07D491/10, A61K31/365, A61K31/496, A61K31/5377, A61K31/416, A61K31/4025, A61K31/4545, A61P35/00, A61P35/02, A61P35/04, // A61K39/00, A61K31/497, A61K31/513, A61K31/54, A61K31/55, A61K39/39, A61K45/06 | [2023/33] | CPC: |
C07D313/00 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
A61K31/496 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K31/365 (EP,IL,KR);
A61K31/497 (EP,IL,US);
A61K31/506 (KR,US);
A61K31/513 (EP,IL,KR);
A61K31/53 (KR);
A61K31/5377 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K31/5386 (US);
A61K31/54 (EP,IL,KR);
A61K31/541 (US);
A61K31/55 (EP,IL,KR);
A61K31/551 (US);
A61K38/191 (US);
A61K38/2013 (US);
A61K38/2066 (US);
A61K38/208 (US);
A61K38/2086 (US);
A61K38/217 (US);
A61K39/39 (EP,IL);
A61K39/3955 (US);
A61K45/06 (EP,IL,KR);
A61K9/0053 (US);
A61P35/00 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61P35/02 (EP,CN);
A61P35/04 (EP,CN);
C07D405/06 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
C07D405/10 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
C07D405/12 (KR,US);
C07D405/14 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
C07D407/12 (US);
C07D409/12 (US);
C07D413/10 (KR,US);
C07D413/12 (US);
C07D413/14 (US);
C07D417/10 (KR,US);
C07D453/02 (KR,US);
C07D471/10 (US);
C07D487/04 (KR,US);
C07D491/08 (KR);
C07D491/10 (EP,CN,IL,KR);
C07D491/107 (US);
C07D498/08 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
A61K2039/505 (KR);
A61K2039/55511 (EP,IL);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/365, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/496, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/497, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/513, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/5377, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/54, A61K2300/00 (EP); |
Former IPC [2021/07] | C07D313/00, C07D405/06, C07D405/10, C07D405/14, C07D498/08, C07D491/10, A61K31/365, A61K31/496, A61K31/5377, A61K31/416, A61K31/4025, A61K31/4545, A61P35/00, A61P35/02, A61P35/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/07] | Title | German: | PLADIENOLIDE-DERIVATE ALS SPLEISSOSOM-GERICHTETE WIRKSTOFFE ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON KREBS | [2022/43] | English: | PLADIENOLIDE DERIVATIVES AS SPLICEOSOME TARGETING AGENTS FOR TREATING CANCER | [2021/07] | French: | DÉRIVÉS DE PLADIENOLIDE EN TANT QU'AGENTS CIBLANT LE COMPLEXE D'ÉPISSAGE POUR LE TRAITEMENT DU CANCER | [2022/43] |
Former [2021/07] | PLADIENOLIDDERIVATE ALS SPLICEOSOM-ZIELMITTEL ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON KREBS | ||
Former [2021/07] | DÉRIVÉS DE PLADIÉNOLIDE EN TANT QU'AGENTS CIBLANT UN COMPLEXE D'ÉPISSAGE POUR LE TRAITEMENT DU CANCER | Entry into regional phase | 11.11.2020 | National basic fee paid | 11.11.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.11.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.11.2020 | Examination requested [2021/07] | 11.11.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.12.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.01.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 28.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.07.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 01.08.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.12.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 21.12.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.07.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 12.09.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 12.09.2024 | Request for further processing filed | 12.09.2024 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AD]WO2015175594 (EISAI R&D MAN CO LTD [JP], et al) | by applicant | WO9014837 | WO9717613 | WO9717614 | WO0114424 | WO02060890 | WO03099813 | WO2004011459 | WO2004011661 | WO2004050890 | WO2005052152 | WO2006009276 | US7189715 | WO2008126918 | US7550503 | US7816401 | US7884128 | WO2013173223 | WO2015175594 | WO2016007235 |