07.08.2024 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
05.06.2024 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
15.03.2024 |
First examination report |
|
14.03.2024 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
17.11.2023 |
Change - representative |
|
14.03.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.03.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
19.08.2021 |
New entry: Decision on request for further processing |
|
10.08.2021 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
10.08.2021 |
New entry: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
10.08.2021 |
New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing |
|
26.06.2021 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
18.06.2021 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 21.07.2021 [2021/29] |
18.06.2021 |
Change - extension states |
published on 21.07.2021 [2021/29] |
17.04.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.01.2021 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 24.02.2021 [2021/08] |
22.01.2021 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
22.01.2021 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 24.02.2021 [2021/08] |
30.12.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.11.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.10.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.10.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.10.2019 |
New entry: applicant or inventor |
|
01.07.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.05.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|