EP3774971 - POLYURETHANE-BASED COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.01.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.11.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.12.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.01.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.10.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 06.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PL | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bostik SA 420, rue d'Estienne d'Orves 92700 Colombes / FR | [2021/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MICHAUD, Guillaume 18 rue Barrème 69006 Lyon / FR | 02 /
WIEGAND, Aurélien Bostik SA ZAC du bois de Plaisance 101 rue du Champ Cailloux 60280 VENETTE / FR | [2021/07] | Representative(s) | Arkema Patent Arkema France DRD-DPI 420, rue d'Estienne d'Orves 92705 Colombes Cedex / FR | [2021/07] | Application number, filing date | 19719576.1 | 03.04.2019 | [2021/07] | WO2019FR50767 | Priority number, date | FR20180052922 | 04.04.2018 Original published format: FR 1852922 | [2021/07] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019193278 | Date: | 10.10.2019 | Language: | FR | [2019/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3774971 | Date: | 17.02.2021 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.10.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3774971 | Date: | 07.02.2024 | Language: | FR | [2024/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/48, C08G18/64, C08G18/73, C08G18/76, C08G18/79, C08G18/22, C08G18/32, C08G18/42, C08G18/66, C08G18/12, C09J175/08, C08K3/26 | [2021/07] | CPC: |
C08G18/4825 (EP);
C08G18/12 (EP,US);
C08G18/227 (EP);
C08G18/3206 (EP);
C08G18/425 (EP);
C08G18/6423 (EP,US);
C08G18/664 (EP);
C08G18/6644 (EP);
C08G18/6674 (EP);
C08G18/6677 (EP,US);
C08G18/7621 (EP,US);
C08G18/7664 (US);
C08G18/792 (EP,US);
C08K3/26 (US);
C09J175/08 (EP,US);
C08K2003/265 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08G18/12, C08G18/6674 (EP);
C08G18/12, C08G18/6685 (EP);
C09J175/08, C08K3/26 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | POLYURETHANBASIERTE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2021/07] | English: | POLYURETHANE-BASED COMPOSITION | [2021/07] | French: | COMPOSITION A BASE DE POLYURETHANE | [2021/07] | Entry into regional phase | 11.09.2020 | National basic fee paid | 11.09.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.09.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.09.2020 | Examination requested [2021/07] | 11.09.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.04.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.12.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.03.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.12.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 21.12.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.12.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 07.02.2024 | HR | 07.02.2024 | PL | 07.02.2024 | NO | 07.05.2024 | RS | 07.05.2024 | GR | 08.05.2024 | IS | 07.06.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | ES | 07.02.2024 | |
HR | 07.02.2024 | ||
NO | 07.05.2024 | ||
RS | 07.05.2024 | ||
GR | 08.05.2024 | ||
IS | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | HR | 07.02.2024 | |
NO | 07.05.2024 | ||
RS | 07.05.2024 | ||
GR | 08.05.2024 | ||
IS | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | NO | 07.05.2024 | |
IS | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | IS | 07.06.2024 | Cited in | International search | [YA]EP1619215 (BAYER MATERIALSCIENCE AG [DE]); | [YA]WO2017109382 (BOSTIK SA [FR]); | [YA]WO2018011491 (BOSTIK SA [FR]) |