EP3782310 - PACKET DETECTOR/DECODER FOR A RADIO TRANSMISSION SYSTEM WITH TRANSMISSION OVER A PLURALITY OF FREQUENCY CHANNELS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.04.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.04.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.12.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.01.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.10.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 10.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastr. 27c 80686 München / DE | [2022/16] |
Former [2021/08] | For all designated states FRAUNHOFER-GESELLSCHAFT zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastraße 27c 80686 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KILIAN, Gerd c/o Fraunhofer-Institut für Integrierte Schaltungen IIS Am Wolfsmantel 33 91058 Erlangen / DE | 02 /
KNEISSL, Jakob c/o Fraunhofer-Institut für Integrierte Schaltungen IIS Am Wolfsmantel 33 91058 Erlangen / DE | 03 /
GAMM, Eberhard Kirchenweg 15 91320 Ebermannstadt / DE | 04 /
BERNHARD, Josef c/o Fraunhofer-Institut für Integrierte Schaltungen IIS Am Wolfsmantel 33 91058 Erlangen / DE | 05 /
KOCH, Robert c/o Fraunhofer-Institut für Integrierte Schaltungen IIS Am Wolfsmantel 33 91058 Erlangen / DE | 06 /
KOHLMANN, Martin c/o Fraunhofer-Institut für Integrierte Schaltungen IIS Am Wolfsmantel 33 91058 Erlangen / DE | [2021/08] | Representative(s) | Schlenker, Julian, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler Zinkler, Schenk & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Radlkoferstraße 2 81373 München / DE | [2021/08] | Application number, filing date | 19720492.8 | 17.04.2019 | [2021/08] | WO2019EP59941 | Priority number, date | DE201810206159 | 20.04.2018 Original published format: DE102018206159 | [2021/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2019202002 | Date: | 24.10.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/43] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3782310 | Date: | 24.02.2021 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.10.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3782310 | Date: | 31.05.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.12.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04L1/00, H04J1/00, H04B1/713, H04B1/00 | [2021/08] | CPC: |
H04L1/0047 (EP,US);
H04B1/0021 (EP,US);
H04B1/713 (EP,US);
H04L1/0052 (EP,US);
H04L5/0005 (US);
H04W84/12 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/08] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PAKET-DETEKTOR/DECODER FÜR EIN FUNKÜBERTRAGUNGSSYSTEM MIT ÜBERTRAGUNG ÜBER MEHRERE FREQUENZKANÄLE | [2021/08] | English: | PACKET DETECTOR/DECODER FOR A RADIO TRANSMISSION SYSTEM WITH TRANSMISSION OVER A PLURALITY OF FREQUENCY CHANNELS | [2021/08] | French: | DÉTECTEUR-DÉCODEUR DE PAQUETS POUR UN SYSTÈME DE TRANSMISSION RADIO AVEC TRANSMISSION SUR PLUSIEURS CANAUX DE FREQUENCE | [2022/50] |
Former [2021/08] | DÉTECTEUR-DÉCODEUR DE PAQUETS POUR UN SYSTÈME DE TRANSMISSION RADIO | Entry into regional phase | 13.10.2020 | National basic fee paid | 13.10.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.10.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.02.2020 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.10.2020 | Examination requested [2021/08] | 13.10.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.12.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.04.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 19.04.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.04.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 31.05.2023 | EE | 31.05.2023 | FI | 31.05.2023 | HR | 31.05.2023 | IT | 31.05.2023 | LT | 31.05.2023 | LV | 31.05.2023 | PL | 31.05.2023 | RO | 31.05.2023 | RS | 31.05.2023 | SE | 31.05.2023 | SI | 31.05.2023 | SK | 31.05.2023 | SM | 31.05.2023 | NO | 31.08.2023 | GR | 01.09.2023 | IS | 30.09.2023 | PT | 02.10.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/25] | CZ | 31.05.2023 | |
EE | 31.05.2023 | ||
FI | 31.05.2023 | ||
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
LT | 31.05.2023 | ||
LV | 31.05.2023 | ||
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
RO | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
SI | 31.05.2023 | ||
SK | 31.05.2023 | ||
SM | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
PT | 02.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | CZ | 31.05.2023 | |
EE | 31.05.2023 | ||
FI | 31.05.2023 | ||
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
LT | 31.05.2023 | ||
LV | 31.05.2023 | ||
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
RO | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
SK | 31.05.2023 | ||
SM | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
PT | 02.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | FI | 31.05.2023 | |
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
LT | 31.05.2023 | ||
LV | 31.05.2023 | ||
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
SK | 31.05.2023 | ||
SM | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | FI | 31.05.2023 | |
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
LT | 31.05.2023 | ||
LV | 31.05.2023 | ||
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | HR | 31.05.2023 | |
LT | 31.05.2023 | ||
LV | 31.05.2023 | ||
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | HR | 31.05.2023 | |
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | PL | 31.05.2023 | |
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | SE | 31.05.2023 | |
NO | 31.08.2023 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US5588028 (PARIZHSKY VLADIMIR [US]); | [IAY]US2004213327 (MILLS DIANE G [US], et al); | [A]US2006245452 (FREDERIKSEN FRANK [DK], et al); | [IAY]US2007211785 (NAKACHE YVES-PAUL [US], et al); | [Y]US2012254703 (RUBIN AMIR [IL]); | by applicant | DE102011082098 |