Extract from the Register for Unitary Patent Protection

UP About this file: EP3807716  C0

EP3807716 - MEDICAL LASER SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusUnitary effect registered
Database last updated on 05.05.2025
FormerRequest for unitary effect filed
Status updated on  07.07.2023
Most recent event   Tooltip02.05.2025New entry: Payment of renewal fee 
Proprietor(s)For all participating member states
Advalight ApS
Industriparken 22A
2750 Ballerup / DK
[N/P]  
Former [2023/33]For all participating member states
Advalight APS
Industriparken 22A
2750 Ballerup / DK
Inventor(s)01 / THORHAUGE, Morten
Bagsværd Hovedgade 99, 8B
2880 Bagsværd / DK
02 / MORTENSEN, Jesper Liltorp
Flemager 11
2600 Glostrup / DK
03 / SEIDLER, Kasper Vikkelsø
Vemmedrupvej 125
4632 Bjæverskov / DK
 [2021/16]
Representative(s)Guardian IP Consulting I/S
Diplomvej, Building 381
2800 Kgs. Lyngby / DK
[2023/33]
Application number, filing date19720601.430.04.2019
[2021/16]
WO2019EP61045
Procedural languageEN
(Principal) place of business   Tooltip
on the date of filing
 Principal place of businessTooltip
Unitary Patent Protection07.07.2023Date of request for unitary effect [2023/33]
13.07.2023Decision on the request for unitary effect:  Positive [2023/33]
13.07.2023Date of registration  [2023/33]
07.06.2023Date of legal effect  [2023/33]
Member States covered by Unitary  Tooltip
Patent Protection
13.07.2023AT, BE, BG, DE, DK, EE, FI, FR, IT, LT, LU, LV, MT, NL, PT, SE, SI  [2023/33]
PublicationType: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3807716
Date:07.06.2023
Language:EN
[2023/23]
Renewal fees paidRenewal fee
24.04.2024Renewal fee unitary effect year  06
25.04.2025Renewal fee unitary effect year  07
The European Patent Register provides the information on unitary patent protection required under R. 16(1) UPR. "Status" and "Most recent event" are not entries required under R. 16(1) UPR and should therefore be regarded as additional information only.

The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes. Please refer to the relevant national patent authority for SPC data.