EP3797437 - CHANGEOVER SWITCH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.01.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.02.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.11.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 11.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BTICINO S.P.A. Viale Luigi Borri, 231 21100 Varese (VA) / IT | [2023/25] |
Former [2021/13] | For all designated states Bticino S.p.A. Viale Borri, 231 21100 Varese / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BROGIOLI, Marco c/o BTICINO SPA Viale Luigi Borri, 231 21100 Varese / IT | 02 /
ROCERETO, Pietro c/o BTICINO SPA Viale Luigi Borri, 231 21100 Varese / IT | 03 /
MARINACI, Andrea c/o BTICINO SPA Viale Luigi Borri, 231 21100 Varese / IT | [2021/13] | Representative(s) | Carangelo, Pierluigi, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Via Tomacelli 146 00186 Roma / IT | [2021/13] | Application number, filing date | 19721062.8 | 22.03.2019 | [2021/13] | WO2019IB52342 | Priority number, date | IT20180005622 | 23.05.2018 Original published format: IT201800005622 | [2021/13] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019224616 | Date: | 28.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3797437 | Date: | 31.03.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.11.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3797437 | Date: | 07.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H01H13/10, H01H13/60, H01H13/68 | [2021/13] | CPC: |
H01H13/10 (EP);
H01H13/60 (EP);
H01H13/68 (EP);
H01H23/205 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/13] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WECHSELSCHALTER | [2021/13] | English: | CHANGEOVER SWITCH | [2021/13] | French: | COMMUTATEUR | [2021/13] | Entry into regional phase | 16.10.2020 | National basic fee paid | 16.10.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.10.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.10.2020 | Examination requested [2021/13] | 16.10.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.05.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.01.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.04.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 19.04.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.04.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 08.03.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 07.06.2023 | ES | 07.06.2023 | HR | 07.06.2023 | PL | 07.06.2023 | RO | 07.06.2023 | RS | 07.06.2023 | SK | 07.06.2023 | SM | 07.06.2023 | NO | 07.09.2023 | GR | 08.09.2023 | IS | 07.10.2023 | [2024/10] |
Former [2024/09] | CZ | 07.06.2023 | |
ES | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 07.06.2023 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4166935 (NORBY THOMAS E [US]); | [A]WO2017141089 (BTICINO SPA [IT]) |