EP3790873 - 1H-INDAZOLE-3-CARBOXAMIDE COMPOUNDS AS GLYCOGEN SYNTHASE KINASE 3 BETA INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.03.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.03.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.01.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.02.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.11.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 13.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.03.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.04.2023 [2023/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aziende Chimiche Riunite Angelini Francesco A.C.R.A.F. S.p.A. Viale Amelia, 70 00181 Roma / IT | [2021/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FURLOTTI, Guido Via Ferdinando Palasciano, 96 00151 Roma / IT | 02 /
CAVARISCHIA, Claudia Via Livorno, 36 00162 Roma / IT | 03 /
BUONFIGLIO, Rosa Via Pasubio, 24 40131 Bologna / IT | 04 /
OMBRATO, Rosella Via Abigaille Zanetta, 68 00143 Roma / IT | 05 /
IACOANGELI, Tommaso Via Baldassarre Orero, 54 00159 Roma / IT | [2021/11] | Representative(s) | PGA S.p.A. Via Mascheroni, 31 20145 Milano / IT | [2021/11] | Application number, filing date | 19721295.4 | 06.05.2019 | [2021/11] | WO2019EP61532 | Priority number, date | EP20180171084 | 07.05.2018 Original published format: EP 18171084 | [2021/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019215075 | Date: | 14.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3790873 | Date: | 17.03.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.11.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3790873 | Date: | 27.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C07D405/14, C07D405/12, C07D409/12, C07D409/14, A61K31/454, A61K31/4545, A61P3/00, A61P25/00, A61P29/00, A61P35/00 | [2021/11] | CPC: |
C07D405/12 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07D405/14 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07D409/14 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K31/4155 (KR);
A61K31/4439 (KR);
A61K31/496 (KR);
A61K31/5377 (KR);
A61P19/10 (KR);
A61P25/00 (KR);
A61P29/00 (KR);
A61P3/10 (KR);
A61P35/00 (KR);
C07D409/12 (EP,IL,KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/11] | Extension states | BA | 04.12.2020 | ME | 04.12.2020 | Validation states | MA | 04.12.2020 | MD | 04.12.2020 | TN | 04.12.2020 | Title | German: | 1H-INDAZOL-3-CARBOXAMIDE ALS GLYCOGEN SYNTHASE KINASE 3 BETA HEMMSTOFFE | [2021/50] | English: | 1H-INDAZOLE-3-CARBOXAMIDE COMPOUNDS AS GLYCOGEN SYNTHASE KINASE 3 BETA INHIBITORS | [2021/11] | French: | 1H INDAZOLE-3-CARBOXAMIDES EN TANT QU`INHIBITEURS DE LA SYNTHASE GLYCOGÈNE KINASE 3 BETA | [2021/50] |
Former [2021/11] | 1H-INDAZOL-3-CARBOXAMID-VERBINDUNGEN ALS GLYCOGEN-SYNTHASE-KINASE-3-BETA-INHIBITOREN | ||
Former [2021/11] | COMPOSÉS DE 1H-INDAZOLE-3-CARBOXAMIDE UTILISÉS EN TANT QU'INHIBITEURS DE LA GLYCOGÈNE SYNTHASE KINASE 3 BÊTA | Entry into regional phase | 04.12.2020 | National basic fee paid | 04.12.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.12.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/11] | 04.12.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.04.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.01.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.03.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 22.03.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.03.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 30.01.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2013124158 (ACRAF [IT]); | [A]WO2013124169 (ACRAF [IT]); | [A]WO2015143380 (SAMUMED LLC [US], et al) | by applicant | WO9410174 | WO2004014864 | WO2004074275 | WO2004101548 | WO2010109005 | WO2013124158 | WO2013124169 | WO2015143380 | US9745271 |