EP3921296 - PROCESS FOR MAKING PHENOL AND XYLENES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.06.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.11.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.08.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 13.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states China Petroleum & Chemical Corporation 22 Chaoyangmen North Street Chaoyang District Beijing 100728 / CN | For all designated states UOP LLC 25 East Algonquin Road P.O. Box 5017 Des Plaines, Illinois 60017-5017 / US | [2021/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Shuguang c/o UOP LLC 25 East Algonquin Road Des Plaines, Illinois 60017-5017 / US | 02 /
ZHOU, Lubo c/o UOP LLC 25 East Algonquin Road Des Plaines, Illinois 60017-5017 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2021/50] | 01 /
ZHANG, Shuguang Des Plaines, Illinois 60017-5017 / US | ||
02 /
ZHOU, Lubo Des Plaines, Illinois 60017-5017 / US | Representative(s) | Moore, Michael Richard, et al Keltie LLP No.1 London Bridge London SE1 9BA / GB | [2021/50] | Application number, filing date | 19721417.4 | 04.02.2019 | [2021/50] | WO2019US16536 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020162877 | Date: | 13.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3921296 | Date: | 15.12.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.08.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.08.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C07C5/27, C07C6/12, C07C15/08, C07C37/50, C07C39/04 | [2021/50] | CPC: |
C07C5/2729 (EP);
C07C37/50 (EP,US);
C07C37/72 (US);
C07C6/126 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C37/50, C07C39/04 (EP);
C07C5/2729, C07C15/08 (EP);
C07C6/126, C07C15/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/50] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON PHENOL UND XYLOLEN | [2021/50] | English: | PROCESS FOR MAKING PHENOL AND XYLENES | [2021/50] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE PHÉNOL ET DE XYLÈNES | [2021/50] | Entry into regional phase | 05.07.2021 | National basic fee paid | 05.07.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.07.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/50] | 05.07.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.06.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]GB1232027 ; | [A]US3790642 (KOMINAMI N, et al); | [A]DE102014110489 (L AIR LIQUIDE SOCIÉTÉ ANONYME POUR L ETUDE ET L EXPL DES PROCÉDÉS GEORGES CLAUDE [FR]); | [E]WO2019103726 (CHINA PETROLEUM & CHEMICAL CORP SINOPEC CORP [CN], et al) |