EP3758685 - CAPSULES WITH OPACIFIER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 02.02.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.07.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.06.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.06.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.05.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.12.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.11.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 14.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Capsugel Belgium NV Rijksweg 11 2880 Bornem / BE | [2021/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PALANGETIC, Ljiljana 38A Noehlen Weg Bat B 68000 Colmar / FR | 02 /
NOMBRET, Delphine 78 route de Selestat 67390 Heidolsheim / FR | 03 /
VANQUICKENBORNE, Stefaan Jaak Zilverberklaan 48 2820 Rijmenam / BE | [2021/01] | Representative(s) | De Clercq & Partners Edgard Gevaertdreef 10a 9830 Sint-Martens-Latem / BE | [2021/01] | Application number, filing date | 19721509.8 | 14.05.2019 | [2021/01] | WO2019EP62360 | Priority number, date | EP20180172133 | 14.05.2018 Original published format: EP 18172133 | [2021/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019219693 | Date: | 21.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3758685 | Date: | 06.01.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.11.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3758685 | Date: | 11.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/48, A61K47/02 | [2021/01] | CPC: |
A61K9/4816 (EP,CN);
A61K9/4825 (CN,US);
A61K47/02 (EP,CN);
A61K47/36 (CN);
A61K47/38 (CN);
A61K9/4808 (US);
A61K9/4833 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KAPSELN MIT TRÜBUNGSMITTEL | [2021/01] | English: | CAPSULES WITH OPACIFIER | [2021/01] | French: | CAPSULES AVEC OPACIFIANT | [2021/18] |
Former [2021/01] | CAPSULES À OPACIFIANT | Entry into regional phase | 02.10.2020 | National basic fee paid | 02.10.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.10.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.09.2019 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.10.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.10.2020 | Examination requested [2021/01] | 02.10.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.05.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.06.2021 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 09.06.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 09.06.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.06.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.07.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP21190633.4 / EP3925602 | EP24193721.8 / EP4450091 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
11.05.2022
17.05.2022
ADMISSIBLE Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE Opponent's representative Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2022/25] | 25.05.2022 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 26.09.2022 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 26.09.2023 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2024/10] | 26.09.2023 | Date of oral proceedings | 13.10.2023 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 13.10.2023 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.05.2019 | AL | 11.08.2021 | AT | 11.08.2021 | CY | 11.08.2021 | CZ | 11.08.2021 | DK | 11.08.2021 | EE | 11.08.2021 | FI | 11.08.2021 | HR | 11.08.2021 | LT | 11.08.2021 | LV | 11.08.2021 | MC | 11.08.2021 | MK | 11.08.2021 | MT | 11.08.2021 | PL | 11.08.2021 | RO | 11.08.2021 | RS | 11.08.2021 | SE | 11.08.2021 | SK | 11.08.2021 | SM | 11.08.2021 | TR | 11.08.2021 | BG | 11.11.2021 | NO | 11.11.2021 | GR | 12.11.2021 | IS | 11.12.2021 | PT | 13.12.2021 | IE | 14.05.2022 | LU | 14.05.2022 | [2024/44] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 14.05.2019 | |
AL | 11.08.2021 | ||
AT | 11.08.2021 | ||
CY | 11.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 11.08.2021 | ||
DK | 11.08.2021 | ||
EE | 11.08.2021 | ||
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
HR | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LV | 11.08.2021 | ||
MC | 11.08.2021 | ||
MK | 11.08.2021 | ||
PL | 11.08.2021 | ||
RO | 11.08.2021 | ||
RS | 11.08.2021 | ||
SE | 11.08.2021 | ||
SK | 11.08.2021 | ||
SM | 11.08.2021 | ||
TR | 11.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
GR | 12.11.2021 | ||
IS | 11.12.2021 | ||
PT | 13.12.2021 | ||
IE | 14.05.2022 | ||
LU | 14.05.2022 | ||
Former [2024/25] | HU | 14.05.2019 | |
AL | 11.08.2021 | ||
AT | 11.08.2021 | ||
CY | 11.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 11.08.2021 | ||
DK | 11.08.2021 | ||
EE | 11.08.2021 | ||
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
HR | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LV | 11.08.2021 | ||
MC | 11.08.2021 | ||
MK | 11.08.2021 | ||
PL | 11.08.2021 | ||
RO | 11.08.2021 | ||
RS | 11.08.2021 | ||
SE | 11.08.2021 | ||
SK | 11.08.2021 | ||
SM | 11.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
GR | 12.11.2021 | ||
IS | 11.12.2021 | ||
PT | 13.12.2021 | ||
IE | 14.05.2022 | ||
LU | 14.05.2022 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AL | 11.08.2021 | |
AT | 11.08.2021 | ||
CY | 11.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 11.08.2021 | ||
DK | 11.08.2021 | ||
EE | 11.08.2021 | ||
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
HR | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LV | 11.08.2021 | ||
MC | 11.08.2021 | ||
MK | 11.08.2021 | ||
PL | 11.08.2021 | ||
RO | 11.08.2021 | ||
RS | 11.08.2021 | ||
SE | 11.08.2021 | ||
SK | 11.08.2021 | ||
SM | 11.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
GR | 12.11.2021 | ||
IS | 11.12.2021 | ||
PT | 13.12.2021 | ||
IE | 14.05.2022 | ||
LU | 14.05.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AL | 11.08.2021 | |
AT | 11.08.2021 | ||
CY | 11.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 11.08.2021 | ||
DK | 11.08.2021 | ||
EE | 11.08.2021 | ||
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
HR | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LV | 11.08.2021 | ||
MC | 11.08.2021 | ||
PL | 11.08.2021 | ||
RO | 11.08.2021 | ||
RS | 11.08.2021 | ||
SE | 11.08.2021 | ||
SK | 11.08.2021 | ||
SM | 11.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
GR | 12.11.2021 | ||
IS | 11.12.2021 | ||
PT | 13.12.2021 | ||
IE | 14.05.2022 | ||
LU | 14.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | AL | 11.08.2021 | |
AT | 11.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 11.08.2021 | ||
DK | 11.08.2021 | ||
EE | 11.08.2021 | ||
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
HR | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LV | 11.08.2021 | ||
MC | 11.08.2021 | ||
PL | 11.08.2021 | ||
RO | 11.08.2021 | ||
RS | 11.08.2021 | ||
SE | 11.08.2021 | ||
SK | 11.08.2021 | ||
SM | 11.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
GR | 12.11.2021 | ||
IS | 11.12.2021 | ||
PT | 13.12.2021 | ||
IE | 14.05.2022 | ||
LU | 14.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AL | 11.08.2021 | |
AT | 11.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 11.08.2021 | ||
DK | 11.08.2021 | ||
EE | 11.08.2021 | ||
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
HR | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LV | 11.08.2021 | ||
MC | 11.08.2021 | ||
PL | 11.08.2021 | ||
RO | 11.08.2021 | ||
RS | 11.08.2021 | ||
SE | 11.08.2021 | ||
SK | 11.08.2021 | ||
SM | 11.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
GR | 12.11.2021 | ||
IS | 11.12.2021 | ||
PT | 13.12.2021 | ||
LU | 14.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/06] | AL | 11.08.2021 | |
AT | 11.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 11.08.2021 | ||
DK | 11.08.2021 | ||
EE | 11.08.2021 | ||
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
HR | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LV | 11.08.2021 | ||
MC | 11.08.2021 | ||
PL | 11.08.2021 | ||
RO | 11.08.2021 | ||
RS | 11.08.2021 | ||
SE | 11.08.2021 | ||
SK | 11.08.2021 | ||
SM | 11.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
GR | 12.11.2021 | ||
IS | 11.12.2021 | ||
PT | 13.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 11.08.2021 | |
AT | 11.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 11.08.2021 | ||
DK | 11.08.2021 | ||
EE | 11.08.2021 | ||
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
HR | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LV | 11.08.2021 | ||
PL | 11.08.2021 | ||
RO | 11.08.2021 | ||
RS | 11.08.2021 | ||
SE | 11.08.2021 | ||
SK | 11.08.2021 | ||
SM | 11.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
GR | 12.11.2021 | ||
IS | 11.12.2021 | ||
PT | 13.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 11.08.2021 | |
CZ | 11.08.2021 | ||
DK | 11.08.2021 | ||
EE | 11.08.2021 | ||
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
HR | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LV | 11.08.2021 | ||
PL | 11.08.2021 | ||
RO | 11.08.2021 | ||
RS | 11.08.2021 | ||
SE | 11.08.2021 | ||
SK | 11.08.2021 | ||
SM | 11.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
GR | 12.11.2021 | ||
IS | 11.12.2021 | ||
PT | 13.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 11.08.2021 | |
CZ | 11.08.2021 | ||
DK | 11.08.2021 | ||
EE | 11.08.2021 | ||
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
HR | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LV | 11.08.2021 | ||
PL | 11.08.2021 | ||
RO | 11.08.2021 | ||
RS | 11.08.2021 | ||
SE | 11.08.2021 | ||
SK | 11.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
GR | 12.11.2021 | ||
IS | 11.12.2021 | ||
PT | 13.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 11.08.2021 | |
DK | 11.08.2021 | ||
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
HR | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LV | 11.08.2021 | ||
PL | 11.08.2021 | ||
RS | 11.08.2021 | ||
SE | 11.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
GR | 12.11.2021 | ||
IS | 11.12.2021 | ||
PT | 13.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 11.08.2021 | |
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
HR | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LV | 11.08.2021 | ||
PL | 11.08.2021 | ||
RS | 11.08.2021 | ||
SE | 11.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
GR | 12.11.2021 | ||
IS | 11.12.2021 | ||
PT | 13.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 11.08.2021 | |
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
RS | 11.08.2021 | ||
SE | 11.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
PT | 13.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 11.08.2021 | |
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
SE | 11.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 11.08.2021 | |
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | Cited in | International search | [XDI]US3784684 (BOSSERT F, et al); | [X]US6790495 (TOMKA IVAN [CH], et al); | [XI]CN105395513 (HUNAN ER-KANG PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD) | by applicant | US3784684 | US5264223 | EP0714656 | EP1072633 | EP1117736 | US2002044970 | US6517865 | JP2003300872 | EP1502588 | US6887307 | EP1574220 | EP1580229 | WO2005105051 | EP1757275 | US2010021535 | WO2011143347 | WO2013164121 | WO2015174868 | US9655860 | WO2018017799 | Opposition | JPH07124462 | WO0107507 | US2009010975 | WO2017182350 |