19.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] |
09.02.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] |
26.01.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.02.2024 [2024/09] |
22.12.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.01.2024 [2024/04] |
11.08.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.09.2023 [2023/37] |
16.06.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.07.2023 [2023/29] |
19.05.2023 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 21.06.2023 [2023/25] |
05.05.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.06.2023 [2023/23] |
28.04.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.05.2023 [2023/22] |
21.04.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.05.2023 [2023/21] |
14.04.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.05.2023 [2023/20] |
17.02.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.03.2023 [2023/12] |
10.02.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.03.2023 [2023/11] |
03.02.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.03.2023 [2023/10] |
27.01.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.03.2023 [2023/09] |
20.01.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.02.2023 [2023/08] |
06.01.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.02.2023 [2023/06] |
15.07.2022 |
Correction of patent specification |
published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] |
13.07.2022 |
Change - representative |
|
17.06.2022 |
Change - applicant |
published on 20.07.2022 [2022/29] |
10.06.2022 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 13.07.2022 [2022/28] |
03.06.2022 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
03.06.2022 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
24.05.2022 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
02.05.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
31.01.2022 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
24.12.2021 |
Change - classification |
published on 26.01.2022 [2022/04] |
24.12.2021 |
Change - classification |
published on 26.01.2022 [2022/04] |
24.12.2021 |
Change - English title |
published on 26.01.2022 [2022/04] |
24.12.2021 |
Change - French title |
published on 26.01.2022 [2022/04] |
18.06.2021 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 21.07.2021 [2021/29] |
18.06.2021 |
Change - extension states |
published on 21.07.2021 [2021/29] |
03.05.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.01.2021 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 17.02.2021 [2021/07] |
15.01.2021 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
15.01.2021 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 17.02.2021 [2021/07] |
25.12.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.11.2020 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
13.11.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.10.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.10.2020 |
Change - representative |
|
27.10.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.10.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.10.2019 |
New entry: applicant or inventor |
|
01.07.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.05.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|