Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3774774 | Global Dossier | 17.08.2022 | B8 | EP3774774 | 13.07.2022 | B1 | EP3774774 | 17.02.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2019EP58959 | 09.04.2019 | DE102018108793 | 13.04.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2019197407 | Global Dossier | 17.10.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102018108793 | 13.04.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102018108793 | 17.10.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102018108793 | 13.04.2018 |