11.04.2025 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
26.03.2025 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.02.2025 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
11.10.2024 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
11.10.2024 |
First examination report |
|
20.06.2024 |
Change - applicant |
published on 24.07.2024 [2024/30] |
27.03.2024 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.03.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.03.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.06.2021 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 07.07.2021 [2021/27] |
04.06.2021 |
Change - extension states |
published on 07.07.2021 [2021/27] |
19.05.2021 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
26.03.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.01.2021 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 17.02.2021 [2021/07] |
15.01.2021 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
15.01.2021 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 17.02.2021 [2021/07] |
09.12.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.11.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
02.11.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
31.10.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.10.2020 |
Change - representative |
|
30.10.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.06.2020 |
New entry: applicant or inventor |
|
30.11.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.10.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.10.2019 |
New entry: applicant or inventor |
|
15.05.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|