EP3774850 - CDP PROTEIN SECRETION INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.01.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.01.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.10.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 15.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.01.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.03.2023 [2023/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kezar Life Sciences 4000 Shoreline Court, Ste. 300 South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | For all designated states The Regents of the University of California 1111 Franklin Street, 12th Floor Oakland, CA 94607 / US | [2021/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MCMINN, Dustin 255 Kent Road Pacifica, CA 94044 / US | 02 /
TAUNTON, John William 2920 22nd St. San Francisco, CA 94110 / US | 03 /
SHARP, Phillip Patrick 19 Boardman Place, Apt. 1 San Francisco, CA 94103 / US | [2021/07] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/07] | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | Application number, filing date | 19722269.8 | 29.03.2019 | [2021/07] | WO2019US24731 | Priority number, date | US201862649718P | 29.03.2018 Original published format: US 201862649718 P | [2021/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019191527 | Date: | 03.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3774850 | Date: | 17.02.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.10.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C07K11/02, A61K38/15 | [2021/07] | CPC: |
C07K11/02 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/07] | Title | German: | CDP-PROTEIN-SEKRETIONSINHIBITOREN | [2021/07] | English: | CDP PROTEIN SECRETION INHIBITORS | [2021/07] | French: | INHIBITEURS DE SÉCRÉTION DE PROTÉINE CDP | [2021/07] | Entry into regional phase | 14.10.2020 | National basic fee paid | 14.10.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.10.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.10.2020 | Examination requested [2021/07] | 14.10.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.05.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.10.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/09] | 25.10.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2023/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2022 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XYI] - YAN CHEN ET AL, "Solution-Phase Parallel Synthesis of a Pharmacophore Library of HUN-7293 Analogues: A General Chemical Mutagenesis Approach To Defining Structure-Function Properties of Naturally Occurring Cyclic (Depsi)peptides", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (20020501), vol. 124, no. 19, doi:10.1021/ja020166v, ISSN 0002-7863, pages 5431 - 5440, XP055598815 [X] 1-3,9-14,18-21,25,26,30-33,35-37,42 * the whole document, in particular abstract and Figures 1 to 10 * [Y] 4-8,15-17,22-24,27-29,34 [I] 41 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja020166v | [Y] - VAN PUYENBROECK VICTOR ET AL, "Inhibitors of protein translocation across membranes of the secretory pathway: novel antimicrobial and anticancer agents", CMLS CELLULAR AND MOLECULAR LIFE SCIENCES, BIRKHAUSER VERLAG, HEIDELBERG, DE, vol. 75, no. 9, doi:10.1007/S00018-017-2743-2, ISSN 1420-682X, (20180105), pages 1541 - 1558, (20180105), XP036478836 [Y] 1-42 * abstract * * section "Cotransins"; page 1545 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00018-017-2743-2 | [Y] - JENNIFER L. GARRISON ET AL, "A substrate-specific inhibitor of protein translocation into the endoplasmic reticulum", NATURE, London, (20050701), vol. 436, no. 7048, doi:10.1038/nature03821, ISSN 0028-0836, pages 285 - 289, XP055598983 [Y] 1-42 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature03821 | [A] - PAATERO ANJA O ET AL, "Apratoxin Kills Cells by Direct Blockade of the Sec61 Protein Translocation Channel", CELL CHEMICAL BIOLOGY , ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20160519), vol. 23, no. 5, doi:10.1016/J.CHEMBIOL.2016.04.008, ISSN 2451-9456, pages 561 - 566, XP029552460 [A] 1-42 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.chembiol.2016.04.008 | [A] - MARKUS GREINER ET AL, "Sec62 protein level is crucial for the ER stress tolerance of prostate cancer", THE PROSTATE, (20110712), vol. 71, no. 10, doi:10.1002/pros.21324, ISSN 0270-4137, pages 1074 - 1083, XP055080540 [A] 1-42 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/pros.21324 | by applicant | - KALIES; ROMISCH, Traffic, (20150000), vol. 16, no. 10, pages 1027 - 1038 | - BERGE et al., "Pharmaceutical Salts", J. Pharm. Sci., (19770000), vol. 66, doi:doi:10.1002/jps.2600660104, pages 1 - 19, XP002675560 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jps.2600660104 |