EP3781265 - ANTI-CD27 AND ANTI-PD-L1 ANTIBODIES AND BISPECIFIC CONSTRUCTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.06.2023 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.01.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.10.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 15.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Celldex Therapeutics, Inc. 53 Frontage Road, Suite 220 Hampton, NJ 08827 / US | [2021/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KELER, Tibor 53 Frontage Road, Suite 220 Hampton, NJ 08827 / US | 02 /
GOLDSTEIN, Joel 53 Frontage Road, Suite 220 Hampton, NJ 08827 / US | 03 /
VITALE, Laura A. 53 Frontage Road, Suite 220 Hampton, NJ 08827 / US | 04 /
HE, Lizhen 53 Frontage Road, Suite 220 Hampton, NJ 08827 / US | [2021/08] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/08] | J A Kemp LLP 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 19722361.3 | 17.04.2019 | [2021/08] | WO2019US27897 | Priority number, date | US201862658899P | 17.04.2018 Original published format: US 201862658899 P | US201962826091P | 29.03.2019 Original published format: US 201962826091 P | [2021/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2019204462 | Date: | 24.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/43] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3781265 | Date: | 24.02.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.10.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.12.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61P35/00, C07K16/28 | [2021/08] | CPC: |
C07K16/2878 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07K16/2827 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61P35/00 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K2039/505 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K2039/507 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K2039/545 (IL,KR,US);
A61K39/0011 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07K2317/14 (EP,IL);
C07K2317/21 (EP,IL,US);
C07K2317/31 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07K2317/32 (KR);
C07K2317/33 (EP,IL,US);
C07K2317/34 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07K2317/35 (IL,US);
C07K2317/565 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07K2317/622 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07K2317/73 (EP,IL);
C07K2317/732 (IL,KR,US);
C07K2317/734 (IL,KR,US);
C07K2317/74 (IL,US);
C07K2317/75 (EP,IL,KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/08] | Extension states | BA | 12.11.2020 | ME | 12.11.2020 | Validation states | MD | 12.11.2020 | Title | German: | ANTI-CD27- UND ANTI-PD-L1-ANTIKÖRPER UND BISPEZIFISCHE KONSTRUKTE | [2021/08] | English: | ANTI-CD27 AND ANTI-PD-L1 ANTIBODIES AND BISPECIFIC CONSTRUCTS | [2021/08] | French: | ANTICORPS ANTI-CD27 ET ANTI-PD-L1 ET CONSTRUCTIONS BISPÉCIFIQUES | [2021/08] | Entry into regional phase | 12.11.2020 | National basic fee paid | 12.11.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.11.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.11.2020 | Examination requested [2021/08] | 12.11.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.12.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2013138586 (JANSSEN BIOTECH INC [US]); | [I]WO2016145085 (CELLDEX THERAPEUTICS INC [US]); | by applicant | US6008200 | US4436727 | US4439196 | US4447233 | US4447224 | US4475196 | US4486194 | US4487603 | US4522811 | US4596556 | EP0198474 | US4676980 | WO8704462 | US4790824 | WO8901036 | EP0304578 | US4866034 | EP0338841 | US4877611 | US4912094 | WO9006951 | US4941880 | EP0414374 | US5064413 | US5312335 | US5374548 | US5383851 | US5399163 | US5399331 | US5416016 | WO9602555 | WO9626277 | WO9629412 | WO9741731 | US5843464 | US5856462 | WO9903884 | WO9933488 | WO9952549 | WO0172329 | WO03040169 | WO2009061996 |