EP3788043 - SPIROPIPERIDINE ALLOSTERIC MODULATORS OF NICOTINIC ACETYLCHOLINE RECEPTORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.05.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.05.2024 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.04.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.04.2024 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.03.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.07.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.02.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.11.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 15.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck Sharp & Dohme LLC 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, New Jersey 07065 / US | [2022/42] |
Former [2021/10] | For all designated states Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065-0907 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CROWLEY, Brendan, M. 770 Sumneytown Pike West Point, Pennsylvania 19486 / US | 02 /
CAMPBELL, Brian, T. 770 Sumneytown Pike West Point, Pennsylvania 19486 / US | 03 /
CHOBANIAN, Harry, R. 2000 Galloping Hill Road Kenilworth, New Jersey 07033 / US | 04 /
FELLS, James, I. 770 Sumneytown Pike West Point, Pennsylvania 19486 / US | 05 /
GUIADEEN, Deodial, G. 2000 Galloping Hill Road Kenilworth, New Jersey 07033 / US | 06 /
GRESHOCK, Thomas, J. 650 Gateway Boulevard South San Francisco, California 94080 / US | 07 /
LEAVITT, Kenneth, J. 127 Union Mill Terrace Mount Laurel, New Jersey 08054 / US | 08 /
RADA, Vanessa, L. 770 Sumneytown Pike West Point, Pennsylvania 19486 / US | 09 /
BELL, Ian, M. 770 Sumneytown Pike West Point, Pennsylvania 19486 / US | [2021/10] | Representative(s) | Merck Sharp & Dohme LLC 120 Moorgate London EC2M 6UR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/10] | Jaap, David Robert Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. 120 Moorgate London, EC2M 6UR / GB | Application number, filing date | 19722488.4 | 29.04.2019 | [2021/10] | WO2019US29561 | Priority number, date | US201862665091P | 01.05.2018 Original published format: US 201862665091 P | [2021/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019212927 | Date: | 07.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3788043 | Date: | 10.03.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.11.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C07D413/14, C07D413/04, C07D417/04, C07D417/14, A61P25/00, A61K31/438, C07D401/04, C07D471/04, C07D471/08, C07D487/04, C07D513/04, A61K31/439, A61K31/444, A61K31/501, A61K31/506 | [2021/10] | CPC: |
C07D413/04 (EP,IL,KR);
C07D413/14 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K31/438 (KR);
A61K31/444 (KR);
A61K31/542 (KR);
A61K45/06 (KR);
A61P25/00 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07D401/04 (EP,IL,KR);
C07D403/08 (US);
C07D413/08 (US);
C07D417/04 (EP,IL,KR);
C07D417/08 (US);
C07D417/14 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07D471/04 (EP,IL,US);
C07D471/08 (EP,IL,KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/10] | Extension states | BA | 01.12.2020 | ME | 01.12.2020 | Validation states | MA | 01.12.2020 | MD | 01.12.2020 | TN | 01.12.2020 | Title | German: | SPIROPIPERIDINDERIVATE ALS ALLOSTERISCHE MODULATOREN VON NIKOTINISCHEN ACETYLCHOLINREZEPTOREN | [2024/11] | English: | SPIROPIPERIDINE ALLOSTERIC MODULATORS OF NICOTINIC ACETYLCHOLINE RECEPTORS | [2021/10] | French: | DÉRIVÉS DE SPIROPIPÉRIDINE EN TANT QUE MODULATEURS ALLOSTÉRIQUES DES RÉCEPTEURS NICOTINIQUES DE L'ACÉTYLCHOLINE | [2024/11] |
Former [2021/10] | ALLOSTERISCHE SPIROPIPERIDINMODULATOREN VON NIKOTINISCHEN ACETYLCHOLINREZEPTOREN | ||
Former [2021/10] | MODULATEURS ALLOSTÉRIQUES DE SPIROPIPÉRIDINE DES RÉCEPTEURS NICOTINIQUES DE L'ACÉTYLCHOLINE | Entry into regional phase | 01.12.2020 | National basic fee paid | 01.12.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.12.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/10] | 01.12.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.07.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.01.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.05.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.09.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.04.2024 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 31.05.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP2905279 (SUMITOMO DAINIPPON PHARMA CO LTD [JP]); | [IA]WO2017165256 (MERCK SHARP & DOHME [US], et al); |