EP3791009 - ELECTROCHEMICAL PRODUCTION OF HYDROGEN FROM SEA WATER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.08.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.09.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.05.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.04.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.01.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.02.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.11.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 20.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Torvex Energy Limited 14 Greenside Close Fishburn Durham TS21 4HD / GB | [2021/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUDSON, Stewart 8 Fairbairn Road Peterlee Durham SR8 5EQ / GB | [2021/11] | Representative(s) | Definition IP Limited The Core Newcastle Helix Bath Lane Newcastle Upon Tyne NE4 5TF / GB | [2021/11] | Application number, filing date | 19723195.4 | 07.05.2019 | [2021/11] | WO2019GB51246 | Priority number, date | GB20180007469 | 08.05.2018 Original published format: GB 201807469 | GB20190000680 | 17.01.2019 Original published format: GB 201900680 | [2021/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019215432 | Date: | 14.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3791009 | Date: | 17.03.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.11.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3791009 | Date: | 04.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C25B1/04, C25B11/04, C25B9/17 | [2023/04] | CPC: |
C25B11/04 (EP,US);
C25B9/65 (US);
C25B1/04 (EP,US);
C25B1/50 (US);
C25B15/04 (US);
C25B9/17 (EP);
Y02E60/36 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/11] | C25B11/02, C25B11/04, C25B1/04, C25B9/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/11] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | 05.10.2020 | Title | German: | ELEKTROCHEMISCHE HERSTELLUNG VON WASSERSTOFF AUS MEERWASSER | [2021/11] | English: | ELECTROCHEMICAL PRODUCTION OF HYDROGEN FROM SEA WATER | [2021/11] | French: | PRODUCTION ÉLECTROCHIMIQUE D'HYDROGÈNE À PARTIR D'EAU DE MER | [2021/11] | Entry into regional phase | 05.10.2020 | National basic fee paid | 05.10.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.10.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.10.2020 | Examination requested [2021/11] | 05.10.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.04.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.01.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.04.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 12.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.08.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 23.08.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.08.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 05.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.10.2023 | CZ | 04.10.2023 | DK | 04.10.2023 | EE | 04.10.2023 | ES | 04.10.2023 | HR | 04.10.2023 | IT | 04.10.2023 | LT | 04.10.2023 | LV | 04.10.2023 | NL | 04.10.2023 | PL | 04.10.2023 | RO | 04.10.2023 | RS | 04.10.2023 | SE | 04.10.2023 | SK | 04.10.2023 | SM | 04.10.2023 | BG | 04.01.2024 | NO | 04.01.2024 | GR | 05.01.2024 | IS | 04.02.2024 | PT | 05.02.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 04.10.2023 | |
CZ | 04.10.2023 | ||
DK | 04.10.2023 | ||
EE | 04.10.2023 | ||
ES | 04.10.2023 | ||
HR | 04.10.2023 | ||
LT | 04.10.2023 | ||
LV | 04.10.2023 | ||
NL | 04.10.2023 | ||
PL | 04.10.2023 | ||
RO | 04.10.2023 | ||
RS | 04.10.2023 | ||
SE | 04.10.2023 | ||
SM | 04.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
NO | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
PT | 05.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | AT | 04.10.2023 | |
DK | 04.10.2023 | ||
EE | 04.10.2023 | ||
ES | 04.10.2023 | ||
HR | 04.10.2023 | ||
LT | 04.10.2023 | ||
LV | 04.10.2023 | ||
NL | 04.10.2023 | ||
PL | 04.10.2023 | ||
RS | 04.10.2023 | ||
SE | 04.10.2023 | ||
SM | 04.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
NO | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
PT | 05.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 04.10.2023 | |
DK | 04.10.2023 | ||
ES | 04.10.2023 | ||
HR | 04.10.2023 | ||
LT | 04.10.2023 | ||
LV | 04.10.2023 | ||
NL | 04.10.2023 | ||
PL | 04.10.2023 | ||
RS | 04.10.2023 | ||
SE | 04.10.2023 | ||
SM | 04.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
NO | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
PT | 05.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 04.10.2023 | |
ES | 04.10.2023 | ||
HR | 04.10.2023 | ||
LT | 04.10.2023 | ||
LV | 04.10.2023 | ||
NL | 04.10.2023 | ||
PL | 04.10.2023 | ||
RS | 04.10.2023 | ||
SE | 04.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
NO | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
PT | 05.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 04.10.2023 | |
ES | 04.10.2023 | ||
HR | 04.10.2023 | ||
LT | 04.10.2023 | ||
NL | 04.10.2023 | ||
PL | 04.10.2023 | ||
RS | 04.10.2023 | ||
SE | 04.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
NO | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
PT | 05.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 04.10.2023 | |
ES | 04.10.2023 | ||
LT | 04.10.2023 | ||
NL | 04.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
PT | 05.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 04.10.2023 | |
NL | 04.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | NL | 04.10.2023 | |
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/17] | NL | 04.10.2023 | Cited in | International search | [XAY]US2004229090 (DAVIS STUART M [US], et al) [X] 11 * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0045]; figure 1 * * paragraphs [0060] , [0 56]; claims 31-45 * [A] 2-7,12,13 [Y] 1,8,10,11; | [XAYI]US2009242424 (BEHR BERND LEOPOLD [AT]) [X] 11 * paragraphs [0035] , [0 38] , [0 41] , [0 71] , [0 56] , [0 57] , [0 50]; figure 1; claims 1-11 * [A] 4,7,9,12,13 [Y] 1-3,5,6,8,10,11 [I] 1,8,10; | [A]US2009321251 (RIGBY DAVID [US]) [A] 1-13* paragraphs [0126] - [0129] - [0 67] - [0070] - [ 104] - [0116] - [0 93]; figures 14-16, 6, 4, 5; claims 1-26; tables A-C *; | [Y]US2010084272 (ROBINSON VIVIAN NOEL EDWARD [AU]) [Y] 2,3,5,6 * paragraph [0132] - paragraph [0143]; figures 9, 10; claims 59-67 * * paragraphs [0010] , [ 100] *; | [XA]US8282812 (BURTCH JOHN CHRISTOPHER [CA]) [X] 11 * figure 1; claim 19 * [A] 1-10,12,13 |