Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2020223431 | Global Dossier | 05.11.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2019US29772 | 30.04.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2020222773 | Global Dossier | 05.11.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2019US29772 | 30.04.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20220002489 | Global Dossier | 06.01.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2019US29772 | 30.04.2019 | WO2020US30608 | 30.04.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20220002488 | Global Dossier | 06.01.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2019US29772 | 30.04.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7453251B | Global Dossier | 19.03.2024 | B2 | JP2022537878 | 31.08.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2019US29772 | 30.04.2019 | WO2020US30608 | 30.04.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2022537877 | Global Dossier | 31.08.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2019US29772 | 30.04.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL287670 | Global Dossier | 01.12.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2019US29772 | 30.04.2019 | WO2020US30608 | 30.04.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL287665 | Global Dossier | 01.07.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2019US29772 | 30.04.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3962476 | Global Dossier | 09.03.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2019US29772 | 30.04.2019 | WO2020US30608 | 30.04.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN114269336 | Global Dossier | 01.04.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2019US29772 | 30.04.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN114206333 | Global Dossier | 18.03.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2019US29772 | 30.04.2019 | WO2020US30608 | 30.04.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3138686 | Global Dossier | 05.11.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2019US29772 | 30.04.2019 | WO2020US30608 | 30.04.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3138473 | Global Dossier | 05.11.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2019US29772 | 30.04.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2020266143 | Global Dossier | 02.12.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2019US29772 | 30.04.2019 | WO2020US30608 | 30.04.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2019443366 | Global Dossier | 02.12.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2019US29772 | 30.04.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3962475 | Global Dossier | 09.03.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2019US29772 | 30.04.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112021021809 | 04.01.2022 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2019US29772 | 30.04.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112021021826 | 21.06.2022 | A8 | BR112021021826 | 04.01.2022 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2019US29772 | 30.04.2019 | WO2020US30608 | 30.04.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CL2021002847 | 22.07.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2019US29772 | 30.04.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CO2021015614 | 10.12.2021 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2019US29772 | 30.04.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CO2021015622 | 28.02.2022 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2019US29772 | 30.04.2019 | WO2020US30608 | 30.04.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MA55799 | 09.03.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2019US29772 | 30.04.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2021013317 | 18.01.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2019US29772 | 30.04.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2021013318 | 31.01.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2019US29772 | 30.04.2019 | WO2020US30608 | 30.04.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG11202112018Y | 29.11.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2019US29772 | 30.04.2019 | WO2020US30608 | 30.04.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG11202112043P | 29.11.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2019US29772 | 30.04.2019 |