EP3962475 - COMBINATION THERAPIES COMPRISING APREMILAST AND TYK2 INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.07.2023 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.02.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.11.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 20.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Celgene Corporation Route 206 & Province Line Road Princeton, NJ 08543 / US | [2024/14] |
Former [2022/10] | For all designated states Celgene Corporation 86 Morris Avenue Summit, NJ 07901 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHAFER, Peter Henry 237 Monroe Avenue Belle Mead, NJ 08502 / US | 02 /
PLENGE, Robert 23 Boulder Brook Road Wellesley, MA 02481 / US | 03 /
ADAMS, Mary 388 Morris Avenue Mountain Lakes, NJ 07046 / US | 04 /
BEEBE, Lisa 151 Arlington Street Acton, MA 01720 / US | 05 /
BUCHWALTER, Gilles 89 Putnam Avenue, Apt. 1 Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | 06 /
CARR, Tiffany 130 Cambridge Park Drive, Apt. 346 Cambridge, MA 02140 / US | 07 /
TZENG, Te-Chen 18 Woodway Drive Shrewsbury, MA 01545 / US | [2022/10] | Representative(s) | Potter Clarkson Chapel Quarter Mount Street Nottingham NG1 6HQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/10] | Potter Clarkson The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | Application number, filing date | 19723291.1 | 30.04.2019 | [2022/10] | WO2019US29772 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020222773 | Date: | 05.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3962475 | Date: | 09.03.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.11.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/4035, A61K31/555, A61K45/06, A61P1/04, A61P17/06, A61P19/02 | [2022/10] | CPC: |
A61K31/4035 (EP,IL,KR);
A61K31/501 (KR);
A61K31/555 (EP,IL);
A61K45/06 (EP,IL);
A61P1/04 (EP,IL);
A61P17/06 (EP,IL,KR);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/4035, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/555, A61K2300/00 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/10] | Extension states | BA | 30.11.2021 | ME | 30.11.2021 | Validation states | KH | 30.11.2021 | MA | 30.11.2021 | MD | 30.11.2021 | TN | 30.11.2021 | Title | German: | KOMBINATIONSTHERAPIEN MIT APREMILAST UND TYK2-INHIBITOREN | [2022/10] | English: | COMBINATION THERAPIES COMPRISING APREMILAST AND TYK2 INHIBITORS | [2022/10] | French: | POLYTHÉRAPIES COMPRENANT DE L'APRÉMILAST ET DES INHIBITEURS DE TYK2 | [2022/10] | Entry into regional phase | 30.11.2021 | National basic fee paid | 30.11.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.11.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.11.2021 | Examination requested [2022/10] | 30.11.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.07.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.12.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [ID]WO2015123453 (PORTOLA PHARM INC [US]) [ID] 1-62 * paragraph [0146] ** claim - *; | [XI]US2016045475 (DAY ROBERT [US]) [X] 1,43-45,50 * claim - * * paragraph [0114] * [I] 2-42,46-49,51-62; | [XI]US2018258086 (GREENWOOD JEREMY ROBERT [US], et al) [X] 1,43-45,50 * claim - * * paragraph [0213] * [I] 2-42,46-49,51-62 | by applicant | US6962940 | WO2008139161 | WO2010055304 | WO2012062704 | US2013178478 | WO2013146963 | WO2013174895 | WO2015016206 | WO2015032423 | US9018243 | WO2015069310 | WO2015089143 | WO2015091584 | WO2015123453 | WO2015131080 | US2015299139 | WO2016027195 | WO2016047678 | WO2016138352 | US9505748 | WO2017040757 | US2017240552 | WO2018067432 | WO2018071794 | WO2018075937 | WO2018081488 | WO2018093968 | WO2018162889 | - XINGRUI HE et al., Expert Opinion on Therapeutics Patents, (20190000), vol. 29, no. 2, pages 137 - 149 |