EP3814392 - CURABLE COMPOSITIONS BASED ON MULTISTAGE POLYMERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.06.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.04.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.01.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 21.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2024 | New entry: Decision on request for further processing | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ARKEMA FRANCE 420, rue d'Estienne d'Orves 92700 Colombes / FR | [2021/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUPTA, Manjuli 1249 Firethorne Drive Easton, Pennsylvania 18045 / US | 02 /
BONHOURE, Lucile Rue Jacques Taffanel 60550 Verneuil en Halatte / FR | [2021/18] | Representative(s) | Arkema Patent Arkema France DRD-DPI 420, rue d'Estienne d'Orves 92705 Colombes Cedex / FR | [2021/18] | Application number, filing date | 19723366.1 | 07.05.2019 | [2021/18] | WO2019EP61740 | Priority number, date | US201862690092P | 26.06.2018 Original published format: US 201862690092 P | [2021/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020001835 | Date: | 02.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3814392 | Date: | 05.05.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.01.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C08F285/00, C08F290/06, C08L51/04, B29C64/00, C09D151/04, C09J151/04 | [2021/18] | CPC: |
C08F290/067 (EP,IL,US);
C08L51/04 (EP,IL,US);
B29C64/124 (US);
B33Y10/00 (EP,IL,US);
C08F220/282 (IL,US);
C08F222/102 (IL,US);
C08F222/103 (IL,US);
C08F285/00 (EP,IL,US);
C08L71/02 (IL,US);
C08L75/16 (IL,US);
C09D151/04 (EP,IL,US);
C09J151/04 (EP,IL,US);
B29K2033/00 (US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08F285/00, C08F222/102, C08F222/103, C08F220/282 (US,EP);
C08F290/067, C08F222/102, C08F222/103, C08F220/282 (US,EP);
C08L51/04, C08L75/16, C08L71/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/18] | Title | German: | HÄRTBARE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN AUF DER BASIS VON MEHRSTUFIGEN POLYMEREN | [2021/18] | English: | CURABLE COMPOSITIONS BASED ON MULTISTAGE POLYMERS | [2021/18] | French: | COMPOSITIONS DURCISSABLES À BASE DE POLYMÈRES À PLUSIEURS ÉTAGES | [2021/18] | Entry into regional phase | 14.01.2021 | National basic fee paid | 14.01.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.01.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.01.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/18] | 14.01.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.06.2024 | Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01) | 30.07.2024 | Reply to an invitation to indicate the basis for amendments | 06.08.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 09.08.2024 | Request for further processing filed | 09.08.2024 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.08.2024 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2012126695 (HUNTSMAN ADV MAT SWITZERLAND [CH], et al); | [X]EP3260279 (EVONIK ROEHM GMBH [DE]); | [XD]WO2018002259 (ARKEMA FRANCE [FR]); | [XP]US2018290377 (TALKEN NICK [US], et al) | by applicant | WO2014126830 | WO2014126834 | WO2014126837 | WO2016102666 | WO2017121749 | WO2017121750 | US2017369696 | WO2017220791 | WO2018002259 | WO2018002260 | WO2018002273 | FR20170056649 | FR20170056647 |