EP3801149 - DISPENSER OF BULK MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.02.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.03.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.12.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 22.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.06.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Société des Produits Nestlé S.A. Entre-deux-Villes 1800 Vevey / CH | [2021/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MOREND, Joël Rte de Villarimboud 17 1553 Châtonnaye / CH | 02 /
YANG, Lin N° 13 Qiao Nan, Cao An Road, Jia Ding District SHANGHAI / CN | [2021/15] | Representative(s) | Ducreux, Marie Société des Produits Nestlé S.A. Avenue Nestlé 55 1800 Vevey / CH | [2021/15] | Application number, filing date | 19723795.1 | 15.05.2019 | [2021/15] | WO2019EP62435 | Priority number, date | EP20180174477 | 28.05.2018 Original published format: EP 18174477 | [2021/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019228800 | Date: | 05.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3801149 | Date: | 14.04.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.12.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.12.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A47J31/40, A47J42/50 | [2021/15] | CPC: |
A47J31/404 (EP,US);
A47G19/34 (US);
A47J42/50 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/15] | Title | German: | SPENDER FÜR SCHÜTTGUT | [2021/15] | English: | DISPENSER OF BULK MATERIAL | [2021/15] | French: | DISTRIBUTEUR DE MATÉRIAU EN VRAC | [2021/15] | Entry into regional phase | 11.01.2021 | National basic fee paid | 11.01.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.01.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/15] | 11.01.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.02.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.06.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5495962 (NOMURA AKICHIKA [JP]) [A] 1-11 * column 6, line 21 - column 13, line 20; figures 1-3 *; | [XAI]US5934516 (STRYCHARSKE JOHN T [US], et al) [X] 1,4-7,11 * column 5, line 48 - column 8, line 37; figures 1-3B * [A] 8-10 [I] 2,3; | [A]JP2003310444 (UNIMAT OFFISCO CORP) [A] 1-11* paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0022]; figures 1-7 *; | [A]JP2004295470 (FUJI ELECTRIC RETAIL SYSTEMS) [A] 1-11 * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0029]; figures 1-3 *; | [AD]EP3028609 (NESTEC SA [CH]) [AD] 1-11 * paragraph [0054] - paragraph [0090]; figures 1-8b * | by applicant | US5934516 | WO2009000810 | EP3028609 |