EP3794424 - SELF-RETAINING DEVICE ASSEMBLIES FOR COMPUTING DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.10.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.02.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.11.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 22.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US | [2021/45] |
Former [2021/12] | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MCCLARY, Gary, Russell Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US | 02 /
NIEMI, Tuomas, Erkki Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US | 03 /
MIN, Byungkwan Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US | 04 /
LEONG, Eric, Mun, Khai Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US | [2021/12] | Representative(s) | CMS Cameron McKenna Nabarro Olswang LLP Cannon Place 78 Cannon Street London EC4N 6AF / GB | [2021/12] | Application number, filing date | 19723943.7 | 29.04.2019 | [2021/12] | WO2019US29554 | Priority number, date | US201815979329 | 14.05.2018 Original published format: US201815979329 | [2021/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019221892 | Date: | 21.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3794424 | Date: | 24.03.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.11.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/16, H04M1/03, H04R1/02, H04R1/08 | [2021/12] | CPC: |
G06F1/1626 (EP);
H04R1/288 (US);
G06F1/1688 (EP);
H04M1/035 (EP);
H04R1/023 (EP,US);
H04R1/086 (EP);
H04R2499/11 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/12] | Title | German: | SELBSTHALTEVORRICHTUNGSANORDNUNGEN FÜR RECHNERVORRICHTUNGEN | [2021/12] | English: | SELF-RETAINING DEVICE ASSEMBLIES FOR COMPUTING DEVICES | [2021/12] | French: | ENSEMBLES DE DISPOSITIFS À AUTO-RETENUE POUR DISPOSITIFS INFORMATIQUES | [2021/12] | Entry into regional phase | 23.10.2020 | National basic fee paid | 23.10.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.10.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.10.2020 | Examination requested [2021/12] | 23.10.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.10.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.02.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAI]US2012177237 (SHUKLA ASHUTOSH Y [US], et al); | [XA]CN207039673U (VIVO COMM TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) |