EP3817967 - METHOD FOR PROVIDING ASSISTANCE DURING A PARKING MANEUVER OF A VEHICLE COMBINATION OF A TOWING VEHICLE AND A TRAILER, SYSTEM, AND COMBINATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.05.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.06.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.03.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.04.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.01.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 24.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 21.02.2024 [2024/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2021/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FOCKE, Thomas Hermannstr. 14 31180 Ahrbergen / DE | 02 /
LOOS, Hartmut Martin-Boyken-Ring 102 31141 Hildesheim / DE | 03 /
KLIE, Patrick Christoph-Hackethal-Str. 22 31139 Hildesheim / DE | [2021/19] | Application number, filing date | 19724157.3 | 09.05.2019 | [2021/19] | WO2019EP61949 | Priority number, date | DE201810210877 | 03.07.2018 Original published format: DE102018210877 | [2021/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020007523 | Date: | 09.01.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3817967 | Date: | 12.05.2021 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.01.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3817967 | Date: | 06.07.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B62D13/06, B62D15/02, B60R1/00 | [2021/19] | CPC: |
B62D13/06 (EP);
B62D15/0275 (EP,US);
B60R1/26 (EP,US);
G06T11/00 (US);
G06T7/70 (US);
G06V20/56 (US);
H04N23/90 (US);
H04N5/272 (US);
H04N7/18 (US);
B60K31/00 (US);
B60R2300/105 (US);
B60R2300/304 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/19] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR UNTERSTÜTZUNG BEI EINEM RANGIERMANÖVER EINES GESPANNS AUS ZUGFAHRZEUG UND ANHÄNGER, SYSTEM UND GESPANN | [2021/19] | English: | METHOD FOR PROVIDING ASSISTANCE DURING A PARKING MANEUVER OF A VEHICLE COMBINATION OF A TOWING VEHICLE AND A TRAILER, SYSTEM, AND COMBINATION | [2021/19] | French: | PROC& XC9;D& XC9; D'ASSISTANCE & XC0; UNE MAN& X152;UVRE D'UN ATTELAGE COMPOS& XC9; D'UN V& XC9;HICULE TRACTEUR ET D'UNE REMORQUE, SYST& XC8;ME ET ATTELAGE | [2021/19] | Entry into regional phase | 03.02.2021 | National basic fee paid | 03.02.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.02.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.02.2021 | Examination requested [2021/19] | 03.02.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.03.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.04.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 01.04.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.04.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 11.04.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 06.07.2022 | CZ | 06.07.2022 | DK | 06.07.2022 | EE | 06.07.2022 | FI | 06.07.2022 | HR | 06.07.2022 | LT | 06.07.2022 | LV | 06.07.2022 | MC | 06.07.2022 | NL | 06.07.2022 | PL | 06.07.2022 | RO | 06.07.2022 | RS | 06.07.2022 | SE | 06.07.2022 | SI | 06.07.2022 | SK | 06.07.2022 | SM | 06.07.2022 | NO | 06.10.2022 | GR | 07.10.2022 | IS | 06.11.2022 | PT | 07.11.2022 | [2024/08] |
Former [2023/37] | AL | 06.07.2022 | |
CZ | 06.07.2022 | ||
DK | 06.07.2022 | ||
EE | 06.07.2022 | ||
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
HR | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
NL | 06.07.2022 | ||
PL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RO | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SE | 06.07.2022 | ||
SI | 06.07.2022 | ||
SK | 06.07.2022 | ||
SM | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
IS | 06.11.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 06.07.2022 | |
CZ | 06.07.2022 | ||
DK | 06.07.2022 | ||
EE | 06.07.2022 | ||
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
HR | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
NL | 06.07.2022 | ||
PL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RO | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SE | 06.07.2022 | ||
SK | 06.07.2022 | ||
SM | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
IS | 06.11.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/23] | CZ | 06.07.2022 | |
DK | 06.07.2022 | ||
EE | 06.07.2022 | ||
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
HR | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
NL | 06.07.2022 | ||
PL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RO | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SE | 06.07.2022 | ||
SK | 06.07.2022 | ||
SM | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
IS | 06.11.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | CZ | 06.07.2022 | |
DK | 06.07.2022 | ||
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
HR | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
NL | 06.07.2022 | ||
PL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RO | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SE | 06.07.2022 | ||
SM | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
IS | 06.11.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | DK | 06.07.2022 | |
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
HR | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
NL | 06.07.2022 | ||
PL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SE | 06.07.2022 | ||
SM | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
IS | 06.11.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | FI | 06.07.2022 | |
HR | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
NL | 06.07.2022 | ||
PL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SE | 06.07.2022 | ||
SM | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
IS | 06.11.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | FI | 06.07.2022 | |
HR | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
NL | 06.07.2022 | ||
PL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SE | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
IS | 06.11.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | FI | 06.07.2022 | |
HR | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
NL | 06.07.2022 | ||
PL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SE | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | FI | 06.07.2022 | |
HR | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
NL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SE | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | FI | 06.07.2022 | |
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
NL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SE | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | FI | 06.07.2022 | |
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
NL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SE | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/06] | NL | 06.07.2022 | Cited in | International search | [AD]DE102009012253 (VALEO SCHALTER & SENSOREN GMBH [DE]); | [A]DE102017201717 (GM GLOBAL TECH OPERATIONS LLC [US]) | by applicant | DE102009012253 | EP2921350 | WO2016082961 | US2016207459 |