EP3791247 - AN ELECTRICALLY CONDUCTIVE MULTILAYER FILM INCLUDING A COATING LAYER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.09.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.09.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.06.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.03.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.02.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.11.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 24.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Canatu Oy Tiilenlyöjänkuja 9 A 01720 Vantaa / FI | [2021/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MIKLADAL, Bjørn Fridur Uutiskatu 3 B 102 00240 Helsinki / FI | 02 /
TIAN, Dewei Mittarinkuja 3 04230 Kerava / FI | 03 /
VARJOS, Ilkka Nikunpellontanner 2 H 15 02920 Espoo / FI | [2021/11] | Representative(s) | Papula Oy P.O. Box 981 00101 Helsinki / FI | [2021/11] | Application number, filing date | 19724222.5 | 03.05.2019 | [2021/11] | WO2019FI50348 | Priority number, date | FI20180005429 | 09.05.2018 Original published format: FI 20185429 | [2021/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019215386 | Date: | 14.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3791247 | Date: | 17.03.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.11.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3791247 | Date: | 01.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/041, B32B9/00, B32B27/30 | [2021/11] | CPC: |
G06F3/041 (EP,FI,KR,US);
H01B5/14 (KR,US);
B32B27/304 (FI,US);
B32B27/365 (FI,US);
B32B37/14 (FI,US);
B32B7/12 (FI,US);
C01B32/15 (US);
C01B32/182 (FI);
C08J5/18 (US);
C08J7/0423 (US);
C08J7/043 (KR,US);
C08J7/044 (KR,US);
C09D127/08 (KR,US);
C09D133/12 (US);
C09D5/24 (KR,US);
G02F1/13338 (FI,KR,US);
G02F1/13439 (FI,KR,US);
C01P2006/40 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/11] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCH LEITFÄHIGER MEHRSCHICHTFILM MIT EINER DECKSCHICHT | [2021/11] | English: | AN ELECTRICALLY CONDUCTIVE MULTILAYER FILM INCLUDING A COATING LAYER | [2021/11] | French: | FILM MULTICOUCHE ÉLECTROCONDUCTEUR COMPRENANT UNE COUCHE DE REVÊTEMENT | [2021/11] | Entry into regional phase | 02.12.2020 | National basic fee paid | 02.12.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.12.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.09.2019 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/11] | 02.12.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.05.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.06.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 12.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 12.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.09.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 02.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 01.11.2023 | ES | 01.11.2023 | HR | 01.11.2023 | PL | 01.11.2023 | RS | 01.11.2023 | SK | 01.11.2023 | SM | 01.11.2023 | NO | 01.02.2024 | GR | 02.02.2024 | IS | 01.03.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | CZ | 01.11.2023 | |
ES | 01.11.2023 | ||
HR | 01.11.2023 | ||
PL | 01.11.2023 | ||
RS | 01.11.2023 | ||
SM | 01.11.2023 | ||
NO | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | ES | 01.11.2023 | |
HR | 01.11.2023 | ||
PL | 01.11.2023 | ||
RS | 01.11.2023 | ||
SM | 01.11.2023 | ||
NO | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | ES | 01.11.2023 | |
HR | 01.11.2023 | ||
PL | 01.11.2023 | ||
RS | 01.11.2023 | ||
NO | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 02.02.2024 | |
IS | 01.03.2024 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2012058255 (GAN THOMAS KOK SIM [SG], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0042] *; | [I]US2012235951 (BROWN DAVID P [FI], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0055] * * paragraph [0061]; figures 2,8 *; | [A]US2014202738 (ALLEMAND PIERRE-MARC [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0035] ** paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0062]; figures 1-2C; claims 1,4 *; | [A]US2017125136 (PARK HYEON CHEOL [KR], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0093] - paragraph [0108] * * paragraph [0112] * * paragraph [0115]; figure 1 * | by applicant | WO2007057501 | WO2009000969 | - NASIBULIN et al., "Multifunctional Free-Standing Single-Walled 20 Carbon Nanotube Films", ACS NANO, (20110000), vol. 5, no. 4, doi:doi:10.1021/nn200338r, pages 3214 - 3221, XP055061064 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/nn200338r |