EP3970299 - SINGLE CARRIER PDCCH TRANSMISSION AND RECEPTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.06.2023 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.09.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.02.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.11.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 25.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.06.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.08.2023 [2023/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Technologies Oy Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | [2022/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TIIROLA, Esa Tapani Porttikellonkuja 12 90450 Kempele / FI | 02 /
HOOLI, Kari Juhani Paloniemenranta 5 C 6 90540 Oulu / FI | 03 /
PAJUKOSKI, Kari Pekka Purantie 3 90240 Oulu / FI | [2022/12] | Representative(s) | Nokia EPO representatives Nokia Technologies Oy Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | [2022/12] | Application number, filing date | 19724482.5 | 15.05.2019 | [2022/12] | WO2019EP62501 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020228950 | Date: | 19.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3970299 | Date: | 23.03.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.11.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04L5/00, H04L5/14 | [2022/12] | CPC: |
H04L5/0091 (EP);
H04L5/0044 (EP,US);
H04L5/0051 (EP,US);
H04L5/0053 (EP,US);
H04L5/1469 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/12] | Title | German: | ÜBETRAGUNG UND EMPFANG VON SC-PDCCH | [2022/40] | English: | SINGLE CARRIER PDCCH TRANSMISSION AND RECEPTION | [2022/12] | French: | TRANSMISSION ET RECEPTION DE SIGNAUX DE TYPE SC-PDCCH | [2022/40] |
Former [2022/12] | EINZELTRÄGER-PDCCH-ÜBERTRAGUNG UND -EMPFANG | ||
Former [2022/12] | TRANSMISSION ET RÉCEPTION DE PDCCH À PORTEUSE UNIQUE | Entry into regional phase | 15.12.2021 | National basic fee paid | 15.12.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.12.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/12] | 15.12.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.09.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.02.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/31] | 16.03.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2023/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2018192405 (GONG ZHENGWEI [CA], et al) [A] 1-29 * claims 1,19 * * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0053] * * paragraph [0076] - paragraph [0084] *; | [A]WO2018127802 (NOKIA TECHNOLOGIES OY [FI], et al) [A] 1-29 * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0044] ** paragraph [0086] - paragraph [0097] * |