EP3794676 - ANTENNA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.07.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.08.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.03.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.02.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mannan, Michael 15 Lapstone Gardens Harrow, Middlesex HA3 0EB / GB | [2023/43] |
Former [2021/12] | For all designated states Mannan, Michael 15 Lapstone Gardens Harrow HA3 0EB / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2021/12] | Representative(s) | Dolleymores 9 Rickmansworth Road Watford, Hertfordshire WD18 0JU / GB | [2021/12] | Application number, filing date | 19724565.7 | 07.05.2019 | [2021/12] | WO2019GB51249 | Priority number, date | GB20180007833 | 15.05.2018 Original published format: GB 201807833 | GB20190001912 | 12.02.2019 Original published format: GB 201901912 | [2021/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP3794676 | Date: | [2023/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019220078 | Date: | 21.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3794676 | Date: | 24.03.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.11.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3794676 | Date: | 06.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/36] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP3794676 | Date: | 25.10.2023 | [2023/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q1/32, H01Q1/38, H01Q9/28, H01Q19/10, H01Q21/28 | [2021/12] | CPC: |
H01Q1/3266 (EP,US);
H01Q9/0407 (GB,US);
H01Q1/32 (GB);
H01Q1/3283 (EP,US);
H01Q1/38 (EP,GB);
H01Q1/44 (GB);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/32] |
Former [2021/12] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANTENNE | [2021/12] | English: | ANTENNA | [2021/12] | French: | ANTENNE | [2021/12] | Entry into regional phase | 04.11.2020 | National basic fee paid | 04.11.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.11.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.11.2020 | Examination requested [2021/12] | 04.11.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 24.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 12.09.2023 | Request for correction of the decision to grant filed | Opposition(s) | 07.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2022 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   29.11.2022 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 06.09.2023 | ES | 06.09.2023 | HR | 06.09.2023 | PL | 06.09.2023 | RO | 06.09.2023 | RS | 06.09.2023 | SK | 06.09.2023 | SM | 06.09.2023 | NO | 06.12.2023 | GR | 07.12.2023 | IS | 06.01.2024 | [2024/25] |
Former [2024/23] | CZ | 06.09.2023 | |
ES | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HR | 06.09.2023 | |
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/11] | HR | 06.09.2023 | |
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | NO | 06.12.2023 | |
GR | 07.12.2023 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US5634209 (PRUDHOMME DENNIS C [US], et al) [Y] 20-24 * column 6, line 39 - column 7, line 30; figures 1,3,5,6 * * column 7, line 60 - column 8, line 27 * * column 8, line 63 - column 9, line 6 *; | [A]WO0159881 (MANNAN MICHAEL [GB]) [A] 1-25 * page 2, line 25 - page 3, line 27; figure 1 * * page 1, lines 3-6 *; | [A]US2015295316 (MANNAN MICHAEL [GB]) [A] 1-25 * paragraphs [0014] - [0022] - [ 0027]; figure 1 *; | [Y]US2016087327 (NIIHARA YOSHIHIRO [JP], et al) [Y] 20,23,24 * paragraphs [0043] - [0044] - [ 0062] - [0065] - [ 0070] - [0073] - [ 0114] - [0123]; figures 1-4,7, 15-18 *; | [IY]GB2544558 (MICHAEL MANNAN [GB]) [I] 1-13,16-19,25 * page 2, line 4 - page 3, line 29; figures 1,2,6 * * page 4, lines 1-16 * * page 5, line 29 - page 6, line 2 * * page 7, lines 24-27 * * page 8, lines 16-20 * [Y] 20-24; | [A] - AHMAD HOORFAR, "Analysis of a "Yagi-like" printed stacked dipole array for high-gain applications", MICROWAVE AND OPTICAL TECHNOLOGY LETTERS, (19981207), vol. 17, no. 5, pages 317 - 321, XP055603839 [A] 1-25 * Section I. Introduction; page 318, column left, paragraph 2; figures 1,2 * * Section III. Numerical Results; page 319, column right, paragraph 1 * |