EP3802379 - CAROUSEL FOR TRANSPORTATION OF ARTICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.05.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.03.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.03.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.12.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 06.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CZ, RO, SK | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states M.D. Viola Macchine S.r.l. Via Lombardia 16/18 27010 Valle Salimbene (PV) / IT | [2021/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VIOLA, Davide c/o M.D. Viola Macchine S.r.l. Via Lombardia 16/18 27010 Valle Salimbene (PV) / IT | 02 /
VIOLA, Marco c/o M.D. Viola Macchine S.r.l. Via Lombardia 16/18 27010 Valle Salimbene (PV) / IT | 03 /
VIOLA, Andrea c/o M.D. Viola Macchine S.r.l. Via Lombardia 16/18 27010 Valle Salimbene (PV) / IT | [2023/27] |
Former [2021/15] | 01 /
VIOLA, Davide c/o M.D. Viola Macchine S.r.l. Via Lombardia 16/ 18 27010 Valle Salimbene (PV) / IT | ||
02 /
VIOLA, Marco c/o M.D. Viola Macchine S.r.l. Via Lombardia 16/ 18 27010 Valle Salimbene (PV) / IT | |||
03 /
VIOLA, Andrea c/o M.D. Viola Macchine S.r.l. Via Lombardia 16/ 18 27010 Valle Salimbene (PV) / IT | Representative(s) | PGA S.p.A. Via Mascheroni, 31 20145 Milano / IT | [2021/15] | Application number, filing date | 19724613.5 | 11.04.2019 | [2021/15] | WO2019IB52992 | Priority number, date | IT20180005900 | 31.05.2018 Original published format: IT201800005900 | [2021/15] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019229551 | Date: | 05.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3802379 | Date: | 14.04.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.12.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3802379 | Date: | 05.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.12.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B65G47/244, A61F13/15, B65H35/08 | [2021/15] | CPC: |
B65G47/244 (EP,US);
A61F13/15764 (EP,US);
B65G47/848 (EP,US);
B65G47/915 (EP,US);
B65H29/241 (EP,US);
B65G2201/022 (EP,US);
B65H2301/33216 (EP);
B65H2301/33222 (EP,US);
B65H2301/4472 (EP,US);
B65H2301/4473 (EP,US);
B65H2403/511 (EP,US);
B65H2406/3452 (EP);
| C-Set: |
B65H2301/4472, B65H2220/01, B65H2220/02 (EP);
B65H2301/4473, B65H2220/01 (EP);
B65H2301/4473, B65H2220/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KARUSSELL ZUM TRANSPORT VON ARTIKELN | [2021/15] | English: | CAROUSEL FOR TRANSPORTATION OF ARTICLES | [2021/15] | French: | CARROUSEL POUR TRANSPORT D'ARTICLES | [2021/15] | Entry into regional phase | 01.12.2020 | National basic fee paid | 01.12.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.12.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/15] | 01.12.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.03.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.05.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 29.05.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.05.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 08.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 05.07.2023 | ES | 05.07.2023 | HR | 05.07.2023 | RO | 05.07.2023 | RS | 05.07.2023 | SK | 05.07.2023 | SM | 05.07.2023 | NO | 05.10.2023 | GR | 06.10.2023 | IS | 05.11.2023 | [2024/23] |
Former [2024/20] | ES | 05.07.2023 | |
HR | 05.07.2023 | ||
RS | 05.07.2023 | ||
SM | 05.07.2023 | ||
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
IS | 05.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | ES | 05.07.2023 | |
HR | 05.07.2023 | ||
RS | 05.07.2023 | ||
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
IS | 05.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | ES | 05.07.2023 | |
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
IS | 05.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | NO | 05.10.2023 | |
GR | 06.10.2023 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2013152360 (SCHOULTZ ADAM [US], et al) [A] 1-15* figures 9, 11 *; | [A]US8607959 (PAPSDORF CLIFFORD THEODORE [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * figures 7, 10-20 *; | [A]WO2014016732 (GDM SPA [IT]) [A] 1-15 * figure 2 * |