EP3788459 - CREATING INTERACTIVE ZONES IN VIRTUAL ENVIRONMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.02.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.10.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.06.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.02.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US | [2021/45] |
Former [2021/10] | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Yijie MICROSOFT TECHNOLOGY LICENSING, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 02 /
CHONG, Yangming MICROSOFT TECHNOLOGY LICENSING, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 03 /
BALAN, Alexandru Octavian MICROSOFT TECHNOLOGY LICENSING, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | [2021/10] | Representative(s) | CMS Cameron McKenna Nabarro Olswang LLP Cannon Place 78 Cannon Street London EC4N 6AF / GB | [2021/10] | Application number, filing date | 19724646.5 | 22.04.2019 | [2021/10] | WO2019US28424 | Priority number, date | US201862664469P | 30.04.2018 Original published format: US 201862664469 P | US201815989846 | 25.05.2018 Original published format: US201815989846 | [2021/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019212774 | Date: | 07.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3788459 | Date: | 10.03.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.11.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3788459 | Date: | 20.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/01, G06F3/04815, G06T19/00, G02B27/01, // G06F3/023 | [2023/47] | CPC: |
G06F3/04815 (EP);
G06T19/006 (EP,US);
G02B27/017 (EP);
G06F3/011 (EP);
G06F3/012 (US);
G06T7/20 (US);
G02B2027/0138 (EP);
G02B2027/014 (EP);
G02B2027/0187 (EP);
G06F3/023 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/10] | G06F3/01, G06F3/0481, G06T19/00, G02B27/01 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/10] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ERZEUGUNG VON INTERAKTIVEN ZONEN IN VIRTUELLEN UMGEBUNGEN | [2021/10] | English: | CREATING INTERACTIVE ZONES IN VIRTUAL ENVIRONMENTS | [2021/10] | French: | CRÉATION DE ZONES INTERACTIVES DANS DES ENVIRONNEMENTS VIRTUELS | [2021/10] | Entry into regional phase | 28.09.2020 | National basic fee paid | 28.09.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.09.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.09.2020 | Examination requested [2021/10] | 28.09.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.06.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.10.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.02.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 10.02.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.02.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 20.03.2024 | FI | 20.03.2024 | HR | 20.03.2024 | LT | 20.03.2024 | LV | 20.03.2024 | NL | 20.03.2024 | SE | 20.03.2024 | NO | 20.06.2024 | RS | 20.06.2024 | GR | 21.06.2024 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/37] | BG | 20.03.2024 | |
FI | 20.03.2024 | ||
HR | 20.03.2024 | ||
LT | 20.03.2024 | ||
LV | 20.03.2024 | ||
SE | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.06.2024 | ||
RS | 20.06.2024 | ||
GR | 21.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/36] | BG | 20.03.2024 | |
FI | 20.03.2024 | ||
HR | 20.03.2024 | ||
LT | 20.03.2024 | ||
LV | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.06.2024 | ||
RS | 20.06.2024 | ||
GR | 21.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 20.03.2024 | |
FI | 20.03.2024 | ||
HR | 20.03.2024 | ||
LT | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.06.2024 | ||
RS | 20.06.2024 | ||
GR | 21.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 20.03.2024 | |
NO | 20.06.2024 | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2012249416 (MACIOCCI GIULIANO [GB], et al) [X] 1-3,12,13,15 * paragraphs [0062] - [0087]; figures 1-2 * * paragraphs [0111] - [0129]; figures 5, 6 * [I] 4-11,14; | [XI]EP2899618 (SONY CORP [JP]) [X] 1-3,12,13,15 * paragraphs [0017] - [0090]; figures 1-4 * * paragraphs [0104] - [0122]; figures 8-11 * [I] 4-11,14; | [X]US2015269783 (YUN IN-KUK [KR]) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0067] - [0124]; figures 1, 2 * * paragraphs [0133] - [0147]; figures 4, 5 *; | [I]WO2015161307 (MAGIC LEAP INC [US]) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0216] - [0219]; figures 1-3 * * paragraphs [0252] - [0254] ** paragraphs [0449] - [0548]; figures 29-36 * |