EP3774862 - NOVEL GLP-1 ANALOGUES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.04.2023 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.05.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.11.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.01.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.10.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 27.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.04.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.05.2023 [2023/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Limited Sun House Plot No. 201 B/1 Western Express Highway Goregaon (E) Mumbai Maharashtra 400 063 / IN | [2021/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
THENNATI, Rajamannar Nima Compound, Near Pratham Enclave, Tandajia Road Baroda, Gujarat 390012 / IN | 02 /
CHATURVEDI, Nishith Nima Compound, Near Pratham Enclave Tandalja Road Baroda, Gujarat 390012 / IN | 03 /
BURADE, Vinod Sampatrao Nima Compound, Near Pratham Enclave, Tandalja Road Baroda, Gujarat 390012 / IN | 04 /
SHAHI, Pradeep Dinesh Nima Compound, Near Pratham Enclave, Tandalja Road Baroda, Gujarat 390012 / IN | 05 /
NATARAJAN, Muthukumaran Nima Compound, Near Pratham Enclave Tandalja Road Baroda, Gujarat 390012 / IN | 06 /
NAGARAJA, Ravishankara Madavati Nima Compound, Near Pratham Enclave Tandalja Road Baroda, Gujarat 390012 / IN | 07 /
ZALAWADIA, Rishit Mansukhlal Nima Compound, Near Pratham Enclave, Tandalja Road Baroda, Gujarat 390012 / IN | 08 /
PANDYA, Kunal Nima Compound, Near Pratham Enclave Tandalja Road Baroda, Gujarat 390012 / IN | 09 /
PATEL, Brijeshkumar Nima Compound, Near Pratham Enclave Tandalja Road Baroda, Gujarat 390012 / IN | 10 /
JOSHI, Dhiren Rameshchandra Nima Compound, Near Pratham Enclave, Tandalja Road Baroda, Gujarat 390012 / IN | 11 /
SONI, Krunal Harishbhai Nima Compound, Near Pratham Enclave, Tandalja Road Baroda, Gujarat 390012 / IN | 12 /
TIWARI, Abhishek Nima Compound, Near Pratham Enclave, Tandalja Road Baroda, Gujarat 390012 / IN | 13 /
PATEL, Vipulkumar Shankarbhai Nima Compound, Near Pratham Enclave Tandalja Road Baroda, Gujarat 390012 / IN | [2021/07] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [2022/23] |
Former [2021/07] | HGF 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | Application number, filing date | 19724915.4 | 05.04.2019 | [2021/07] | WO2019IB52835 | Priority number, date | IN201821013109 | 05.04.2018 Original published format: IN201821013109 | IN201821040468 | 26.10.2018 Original published format: IN201821040468 | IN201821040474 | 26.10.2018 Original published format: IN201821040474 | [2021/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019193576 | Date: | 10.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3774862 | Date: | 17.02.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.10.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3774862 | Date: | 08.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/00, C07K14/605 | [2021/39] | CPC: |
C07K14/605 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,CN,IL,US);
A61K38/26 (KR);
A61K9/0053 (IL,US);
A61P3/04 (CN,IL,KR,US);
A61P3/10 (CN,IL,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [2021/07] | C07K14/605, A61K38/26 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | 26.10.2020 | MA | 26.10.2020 | TN | 26.10.2020 | Title | German: | NEUARTIGE GLP-1-ANALOGA | [2021/07] | English: | NOVEL GLP-1 ANALOGUES | [2021/07] | French: | NOUVEAUX ANALOGUES DE GLP-1 | [2021/07] | Entry into regional phase | 26.10.2020 | National basic fee paid | 26.10.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.10.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.10.2020 | Examination requested [2021/07] | 26.10.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.11.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.03.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 04.03.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.03.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP22177403.7 / EP4122954 | EP24161843.8 | Opposition(s) | 10.03.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 08.06.2022 | [2023/17] | Cited in | International search | [AD]WO2006097537 (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK], et al); | [A]WO2006097538 (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK], et al); | [AP]WO2018178796 (SUN PHARMACEUTICAL IND LTD [IN]); | by applicant | WO9808871 | WO9943705 | WO9943706 | WO9943707 | WO9943708 | WO0034331 | US6268343 | WO2004078777 | WO2004103390 | WO2005027978 | US7084243 | WO2006097537 | WO2007030519 | WO2007039140 | US7291594 | US7482321 | WO2009030771 | US7893017 | US7897566 | WO2011080103 | WO2012016419 | WO2012062803 | WO2012062804 | WO2012140117 | WO2013037690 | WO2013051938 | US8603972 | WO2013186240 | US8648041 | WO2014202727 | WO2014209886 | WO2015000942 | US8951959 | WO2015022400 | US9006178 | US2015133374 | US2015152157 | WO2015086686 | US9266940 | WO2016083499 | WO2016097108 | US2016200791 | US9498534 | WO2016198544 | US9708383 | WO2017149070 | US9758560 | WO2017211922 | WO2018083335 |