EP3801170 - WIPER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2021/15] | WIPER MOP PLATE | ||
[2024/12] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.06.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.02.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.01.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.03.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.12.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 28.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 24.07.2024 [2024/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Carl Freudenberg KG Höhnerweg 2-4 69469 Weinheim / DE | [2021/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRUGORA, Alessandro Via Fornace 9 20063 Cernusco sul Naviglio / IT | [2021/15] | Application number, filing date | 19725110.1 | 16.05.2019 | [2021/15] | WO2019EP62569 | Priority number, date | DE201810112821 | 29.05.2018 Original published format: DE102018112821 | [2021/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019228817 | Date: | 05.12.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3801170 | Date: | 14.04.2021 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.12.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3801170 | Date: | 24.07.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.12.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A47L13/253, A47L13/258 | [2021/15] | CPC: |
A47L13/253 (EP);
A47L13/258 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WISCHPLATTE | [2021/15] | English: | WIPER | [2024/12] | French: | SAGESSE | [2024/12] |
Former [2021/15] | WIPER MOP PLATE | ||
Former [2021/15] | PLAQUE DE NETTOYAGE | Entry into regional phase | 11.11.2020 | National basic fee paid | 11.11.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.11.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.11.2020 | Examination requested [2021/15] | 11.11.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.01.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.05.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.06.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 17.06.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.06.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE19916556 (SET HIGH TECH AG WOLFHALDEN [CH]); | [XA]DE102005044507 (LEIFHEIT AG [DE]); | [XA]CN2887238Y (CAI LIRONG [CN]) | by applicant | DE102012007525 |