EP3784685 - THERMOSTABLE VIRAL REVERSE TRANSCRIPTASE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.01.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.11.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 29.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qiagen Beverly, LLC 100 Cummings Center, Suite 407J Beverly, MA 01915 / US | [2021/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHOENFELD, Thomas William 205 Haverhill Rd. Topsfield, Massachusetts 01983 / US | 02 /
HELLER, Ryan Charles 12 Ash St. Amesbury, Massachusetts 01913 / US | 03 /
CRISSY, Katarzyna 9 Wentworth Cir. Windham, New Hampshire 03087 / US | 04 /
CHUNG, Suhman 324 Highland St. South Hamilton, Massachusetts 01982 / US | [2021/09] | Representative(s) | Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/09] | Friedrich, Rainer Breuer Friedrich Hahner Patentanwälte PartG mbB i. Gr. Brienner Strasse 1 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19725415.4 | 30.04.2019 | [2021/09] | WO2019IB53537 | Priority number, date | US201862665560P | 02.05.2018 Original published format: US 201862665560 P | EP20180173195 | 18.05.2018 Original published format: EP 18173195 | US201962790483P | 10.01.2019 Original published format: US 201962790483 P | US201962835521P | 18.04.2019 Original published format: US 201962835521 P | [2021/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019211749 | Date: | 07.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3784685 | Date: | 03.03.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.11.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/005, C12N9/12 | [2021/09] | CPC: |
C07K14/005 (EP);
C07K14/00 (US);
C12N9/1241 (EP);
C12N9/1276 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6844 (US);
C12N2795/00022 (EP);
C12Q2531/113 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/09] | Title | German: | TEMPERATURSTABILE VIRALE REVERSE TRANSKRIPTASE | [2021/09] | English: | THERMOSTABLE VIRAL REVERSE TRANSCRIPTASE | [2021/09] | French: | TRANSCRIPTASE INVERSE VIRALE THERMOSTABLE | [2021/09] | Entry into regional phase | 26.11.2020 | National basic fee paid | 26.11.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.11.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.11.2020 | Examination requested [2021/09] | 26.11.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.04.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2007044671 (LUCIGEN CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * claim 1 ** sequence 14 *; | [A] - "SubName: Full=DNA polymerase I {ECO:0000313|EMBL:AGL03983.1}; Flags: Fragment;", UniProt, (20130724), Database accession no. R4KLB5, URL: EBI, XP002783977 [A] 1-15 * sequence . * | by applicant | US5455170 | US8093030 | - "GenBank", Database accession no. AFN99405.1 | - "GenBank", Database accession no. AGL03984 | - LUNDBERG KS et al., Gene, (19910000), vol. 108, no. 1, pages 1 - 6 | - Current Protocols in Molecular Biology, (19970000), vol. I, II, III | - DNA Cloning: A Practical Approach, (19850000), vol. I, II | - Methods in Enzymology, vol. 154, 155 | - "GenBank", Database accession no. V00642.1 | - "GenBank", Database accession no. NM_005566.3 | - "GenBank", Database accession no. NR_117890.1 |