EP3791284 - CONFLICT RESOLUTION FOR MULTI-MASTER DISTRIBUTED DATABASES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.10.2022 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.02.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.11.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 29.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.09.2024 | New entry: Despatch of communication that application is refused | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US | [2021/45] |
Former [2021/11] | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAMAN, Karthik c/o Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052 / US | 02 /
AL- GHOSIEN, Momin, Mahmoud c/o Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052 / US | 03 /
RANGANATHAN, Bhalakumaaran Erode c/o Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052 / US | 04 /
GAJENDRAN, Madhan c/o Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052 / US | 05 /
HUANG, Ji c/o Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052 / US | 06 /
KATIYAR, Atul c/o Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052 / US | 07 /
KOLTACHEV, Mikhail Mikhailovich c/o Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052 / US | 08 /
KURUVILLA, Sujit Vattathil c/o Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052 / US | 09 /
MAKWANA, Digvijaysinh Govindbhai 340 Hayes St San Francisco, California 94102 / US | 10 /
PATTIPAKA, Subramanyam c/o Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052 / US | 11 /
PLATON, Ovidiu Constantin c/o Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052 / US | 12 /
SHAH, Ankur Savailal c/o Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052 / US | 13 /
SHARMA, Pankaj c/o Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052 / US | 14 /
SHUKLA, Dharma c/o Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052 / US | 15 /
SINGHAL, Shreshth c/o Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052 / US | 16 /
THOTA, Shireesh Kumar c/o Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052 / US | [2021/11] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2021/11] | Application number, filing date | 19725536.7 | 07.05.2019 | [2021/11] | WO2019US31207 | Priority number, date | US201862668226P | 07.05.2018 Original published format: US 201862668226 P | US201816207170 | 02.12.2018 Original published format: US201816207170 | [2021/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019217481 | Date: | 14.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3791284 | Date: | 17.03.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.11.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/50, G06F16/901, // G06F9/46 | [2023/19] | CPC: |
G06F9/5061 (EP);
G06F16/2365 (US);
G06F11/2007 (US);
G06F11/2023 (US);
G06F11/2056 (US);
G06F16/184 (US);
G06F16/211 (US);
G06F16/219 (US);
G06F16/2246 (US);
G06F16/2255 (US);
G06F16/2272 (US);
G06F16/2315 (US);
G06F16/2322 (US);
G06F16/2329 (US);
G06F16/2336 (US);
G06F16/2452 (US);
G06F16/252 (US);
G06F16/258 (US);
G06F16/27 (US);
G06F16/273 (EP);
G06F16/28 (US);
G06F16/9024 (EP);
G06F16/9027 (EP);
G06F16/903 (US);
G06F9/5077 (US);
H04L41/0803 (US);
H04L41/0896 (EP,US);
H04L41/5009 (US);
H04L41/5019 (US);
H04L41/5022 (US);
H04L41/5032 (US);
H04L47/72 (US);
H04L47/762 (US);
H04L47/83 (EP);
H04L67/1008 (EP,US);
H04L67/1012 (EP,US);
H04L67/1034 (EP,US);
H04L67/565 (EP);
H04L69/24 (US);
G06F2201/80 (US);
G06F2209/505 (EP);
G06F9/468 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2021/11] | G06F16/27, G06F9/52 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/11] | Title | German: | KONFLIKTAUFLÖSUNG FÜR VERTEILTE MULTI-MASTER-DATENBANKEN | [2021/11] | English: | CONFLICT RESOLUTION FOR MULTI-MASTER DISTRIBUTED DATABASES | [2021/11] | French: | RÉSOLUTION DE CONFLIT DESTINÉE À DES BASES DE DONNÉES RÉPARTIES À MAÎTRES MULTIPLES | [2021/11] | Entry into regional phase | 02.11.2020 | National basic fee paid | 02.11.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.11.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.11.2020 | Examination requested [2021/11] | 02.11.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.10.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.11.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.12.2023 | Date of oral proceedings | 03.01.2024 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 27.06.2024 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 02.07.2024 | 02.07.2024 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 17.09.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9735270 (ORACLE CORP [US], et al); | [XI]US2006106879 (ZONDERVAN QUINTON Y [US], et al); | [A]US2016034433 (YAMAT JAMES [US], et al); | [A]US2017364345 (FONTOURA MARCUS [US], et al) |