Designated contracting states | AL | |
AT | Lapse: 26.06.2024 |
BE | |
BG | Lapse: 26.06.2024 |
CH | |
CY | |
CZ | Lapse: 26.06.2024 |
DE | |
DK | Lapse: 26.06.2024 |
EE | Lapse: 26.06.2024 |
ES | Lapse: 26.06.2024 |
FI | Lapse: 26.06.2024 |
FR | |
GB | |
GR | Lapse: 27.09.2024 |
HR | Lapse: 26.06.2024 |
HU | |
IE | |
IS | Lapse: 26.10.2024 |
IT | Lapse: 26.06.2024 |
LI | |
LT | |
LU | |
LV | Lapse: 26.06.2024 |
MC | |
MK | |
MT | |
NL | Lapse: 26.06.2024 |
NO | Lapse: 26.09.2024 |
PL | Lapse: 26.06.2024 |
PT | Lapse: 28.10.2024 |
RO | Lapse: 26.06.2024 |
RS | Lapse: 26.09.2024 |
SE | |
SI | |
SK | Lapse: 26.06.2024 |
SM | Lapse: 26.06.2024 |
TR | |
Validation states | KH | |
MA | |
MD | |
TN | |
Examination procedure | 14.05.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
Entry into regional phase | 09.12.2020 | National basic fee paid | |
09.12.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | |
09.12.2020 | Examination fee paid | |
Fees paid | Renewal fee |
19.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
18.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
23.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
21.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
European patent granted | 26.06.2024 |
Opposition procedure | 27.03.2025 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.06.2025 |
INPADOC data Tooltip | The EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority. |
Event date: | 24.03.2021 | |
Event description: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES |
Kind Code of Ref Document: | A1 |
Designated State(s): | AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR |
|
Event date: | 24.03.2021 | |
Event description: | REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT |
Validation States: | BA ME |
|
Event date: | 24.03.2021 | |
Event description: | REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED |
Effective DATE: | 20201209 |
|
Event date: | 19.02.2021 | |
Event description: | PUBLIC REFERENCE MADE UNDER ARTICLE 153(3) EPC TO A PUBLISHED INTERNATIONAL APPLICATION THAT HAS ENTERED THE EUROPEAN PHASE |
Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009012 |
|
Event date: | 19.02.2021 | |
Event description: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT |
Free Format Text: | STATUS: REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION WAS MADE |
|
Event date: | 22.11.2019 | |
Event description: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT |
Free Format Text: | STATUS: THE INTERNATIONAL PUBLICATION HAS BEEN MADE |
|
Event date: | 29.05.2019 | |
Event description: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT |
Free Format Text: | STATUS: UNKNOWN |
|
Event date: | 25.08.2021 | |
Event description: | REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (DELETED) |
|
Event date: | 25.08.2021 | |
Event description: | REQUEST FOR VALIDATION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (DELETED) |
|
Event date: | 27.01.2021 | |
Event description: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT |
Free Format Text: | STATUS: THE INTERNATIONAL PUBLICATION HAS BEEN MADE |
|
Event date: | 21.01.2024 | |
Event description: | DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT |
Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR1 |
|
Event date: | 21.01.2024 | |
Event description: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT |
Free Format Text: | STATUS: GRANT OF PATENT IS INTENDED |
|
Event date: | 05.01.2024 | |
Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE |
Event code: | REG DE R079 |
Code Expl.: | AMENDMENT OF IPC MAIN CLASS |
Free Format Text: | PREVIOUS MAIN CLASS: A61M0001100000 |
IPC CLASSIFICATION: | A61M0060178000 |
|
Event date: | 14.02.2024 | |
Event description: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT |
IPC CLASSIFICATION: | A61M 60/178 20210101AFI20240105BHEP |
|
Event date: | 14.02.2024 | |
Event description: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT |
IPC CLASSIFICATION: | A61M 60/216 20210101ALI20240105BHEP |
|
Event date: | 14.02.2024 | |
Event description: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT |
IPC CLASSIFICATION: | A61M 60/242 20210101ALI20240105BHEP |
|
Event date: | 14.02.2024 | |
Event description: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT |
IPC CLASSIFICATION: | A61M 60/422 20210101ALI20240105BHEP |
|
Event date: | 14.02.2024 | |
Event description: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT |
IPC CLASSIFICATION: | A61M 60/546 20210101ALI20240105BHEP |
|
Event date: | 14.02.2024 | |
Event description: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT |
IPC CLASSIFICATION: | A61M 60/562 20210101ALI20240105BHEP |
|
Event date: | 21.02.2024 | |
Event description: | INTENTION TO GRANT ANNOUNCED |
Effective DATE: | 20240122 |
|
Event date: | 14.05.2024 | |
Event description: | GRANT FEE PAID |
Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR3 |
|
Event date: | 24.05.2024 | |
Event description: | (EXPECTED) GRANT |
Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009210 |
|
Event date: | 24.05.2024 | |
Event description: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT |
Free Format Text: | STATUS: THE PATENT HAS BEEN GRANTED |
|
Event date: | 05.01.2024 | |
Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE |
Event code: | REG DE R079 602019054186 DE |
Code Expl.: | AMENDMENT OF IPC MAIN CLASS |
Free Format Text: | PREVIOUS MAIN CLASS: A61M0001100000 |
IPC CLASSIFICATION: | A61M0060178000 |
|
Event date: | 26.06.2024 | |
Event description: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES |
Kind Code of Ref Document: | B1 |
Designated State(s): | AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR |
|
Event date: | 26.06.2024 | |
Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE |
Event code: | REG GB FG4D |
Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED |
|
Event date: | 28.06.2024 | |
Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE |
Event code: | REG CH EP |
Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENT TAKES EFFECT AS A NATIONAL PATENT IN CH/LI |
|
Event date: | 08.10.2024 | |
Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] |
Ref Country Code: | BG |
Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT |
Effective DATE: | 20240626 |
|
Event date: | 10.10.2024 | |
Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] |
Ref Country Code: | FI |
Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT |
Effective DATE: | 20240626 |
|
Event date: | 10.10.2024 | |
Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] |
Ref Country Code: | HR |
Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT |
Effective DATE: | 20240626 |
|
Event date: | 10.10.2024 | |
Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE |
Event code: | REG LT MG9D |
Code Expl.: | -INVALIDATION OF EXTENSION OF EUROPEAN PATENTS |
|
Event date: | 11.10.2024 | |
Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] |
Ref Country Code: | GR |
Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT |
Effective DATE: | 20240927 |
|
Event date: | 30.10.2024 | |
Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] |
Ref Country Code: | LV |
Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT |
Effective DATE: | 20240626 |
|
Event date: | 31.10.2024 | |
Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] |
Ref Country Code: | RS |
Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT |
Effective DATE: | 20240926 |
|
Event date: | 31.10.2024 | |
Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] |
Ref Country Code: | BG |
Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT |
Effective DATE: | 20240626 |
|
Event date: | 31.10.2024 | |
Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] |
Ref Country Code: | FI |
Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT |
Effective DATE: | 20240626 |
|
Event date: | 31.10.2024 | |
Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] |
Ref Country Code: | GR |
Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT |
Effective DATE: | 20240927 |
|
Event date: | 31.10.2024 | |
Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] |
Ref Country Code: | HR |
Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT |
Effective DATE: | 20240626 |
|
Event date: | 31.10.2024 | |
Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] |
Ref Country Code: | LV |
Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT |
Effective DATE: | 20240626 |
|
Event date: | 31.10.2024 | |
Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] |
Ref Country Code: | NO |
Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT |
Effective DATE: | 20240926 |
|
Event date: | 15.11.2024 | |
Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] |
Ref Country Code: | NL |
Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT |
Effective DATE: | 20240626 |
|
Event date: | 15.11.2024 | |
Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE |
Event code: | REG AT MK05 1697201 AT T |
Code Expl.: | -DELETION ACC. TO PAR. 5 (WITHDRAWAL OF THE TRANSLATION OF THE EP PATENT) |
Effective DATE: | 20240626 |
|
Event date: | 29.11.2024 | |
Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] |
Ref Country Code: | NL |
Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT |
Effective DATE: | 20240626 |
|
Event date: | 12.12.2024 | |
Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] |
Ref Country Code: | PT |
Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT |
Effective DATE: | 20241028 |
|
Event date: | 31.12.2024 | |
Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] |
Ref Country Code: | PT |
Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT |
Effective DATE: | 20241028 |
|
Event date: | 08.01.2025 | |
Event description: | PARTY DATA CHANGED (PATENT OWNER DATA CHANGED OR RIGHTS OF A PATENT TRANSFERRED) |
OWNER: | BOSTON SCIENTIFIC SCIMED, INC. |
|
Event date: | 16.01.2025 | |
Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] |
Ref Country Code: | PL |
Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT |
Effective DATE: | 20240626 |
|
Event date: | 21.01.2025 | |
Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] |
Ref Country Code: | EE |
Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT |
Effective DATE: | 20240626 |
|
Event date: | 23.01.2025 | |
Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] |
Ref Country Code: | IS |
Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT |
Effective DATE: | 20241026 |
|
Event date: | 23.01.2025 | |
Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] |
Ref Country Code: | AT |
Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT |
Effective DATE: | 20240626 |
|
Event date: | 24.01.2025 | |
Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] |
Ref Country Code: | CZ |
Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT |
Effective DATE: | 20240626 |
|
Event date: | 27.01.2025 | |
Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] |
Ref Country Code: | SK |
Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT |
Effective DATE: | 20240626 |
|
Event date: | 27.01.2025 | |
Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] |
Ref Country Code: | RO |
Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT |
Effective DATE: | 20240626 |
|
Event date: | 28.01.2025 | |
Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] |
Ref Country Code: | ES |
Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT |
Effective DATE: | 20240626 |
|
Event date: | 28.01.2025 | |
Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] |
Ref Country Code: | SM |
Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT |
Effective DATE: | 20240626 |
|
Event date: | 31.01.2025 | |
Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] |
Ref Country Code: | AT |
Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT |
Effective DATE: | 20240626 |
|
Event date: | 31.01.2025 | |
Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] |
Ref Country Code: | CZ |
Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT |
Effective DATE: | 20240626 |
|
Event date: | 31.01.2025 | |
Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] |
Ref Country Code: | EE |
Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT |
Effective DATE: | 20240626 |
|
Event date: | 31.01.2025 | |
Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] |
Ref Country Code: | ES |
Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT |
Effective DATE: | 20240626 |
|
Event date: | 31.01.2025 | |
Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] |
Ref Country Code: | IS |
Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT |
Effective DATE: | 20241026 |
|
Event date: | 31.01.2025 | |
Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] |
Ref Country Code: | PL |
Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT |
Effective DATE: | 20240626 |
|
Event date: | 31.01.2025 | |
Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] |
Ref Country Code: | RO |
Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT |
Effective DATE: | 20240626 |
|
Event date: | 31.01.2025 | |
Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] |
Ref Country Code: | SK |
Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT |
Effective DATE: | 20240626 |
|
Event date: | 31.01.2025 | |
Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] |
Ref Country Code: | SM |
Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT |
Effective DATE: | 20240626 |
|
Event date: | 06.02.2025 | |
Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] |
Ref Country Code: | IT |
Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT |
Effective DATE: | 20240626 |
|
Event date: | 15.04.2025 | |
Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] |
Ref Country Code: | DK |
Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT |
Effective DATE: | 20240626 |
|
Event date: | 02.05.2025 | |
Event description: | NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT |
Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009261 |
|
Event date: | 02.05.2025 | |
Event description: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT |
Free Format Text: | STATUS: NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT |
|
Event date: | 18.07.2024 | |
Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE |
Event code: | REG DE R096 602019054186 DE |
Code Expl.: | +DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT |
|