EP3953584 - COMPRESSOR VALVE ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.10.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.06.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.01.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.11.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 29.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT, SK | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Energy, Inc. 4400 N Alafaya Trail Orlando, FL 32826 / US | [2023/41] |
Former [2022/07] | For all designated states Dresser-Rand Company 15375 Memorial Drive Suite 600 Houston TX 77079 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SANFORD, Joel T. 8851 State Route 53 Bath, NY 14810 / US | [2022/07] | Representative(s) | Horn Kleimann Waitzhofer Schmid-Dreyer Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Theresienhöhe 12 80339 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/48] | Horn Kleimann Waitzhofer Schmid-Dreyer Patentanwälte- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Theresienhöhe 12 80339 München / DE | ||
Former [2022/07] | Horn Kleimann Waitzhofer Patentanwälte PartG mbB Ganghoferstrasse 29a 80339 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19725600.1 | 09.05.2019 | [2022/07] | WO2019US31557 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020226657 | Date: | 12.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3953584 | Date: | 16.02.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.11.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3953584 | Date: | 29.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | F04B39/10, F04B39/14 | [2022/07] | CPC: |
F04B39/1013 (EP,US);
F04B39/0022 (US);
F04B39/1053 (US);
F04B39/1066 (EP);
F04B39/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KOMPRESSORVENTILANORDNUNG | [2022/07] | English: | COMPRESSOR VALVE ASSEMBLY | [2022/07] | French: | ENSEMBLE SOUPAPE DE COMPRESSEUR | [2022/07] | Entry into regional phase | 08.11.2021 | National basic fee paid | 08.11.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.11.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.11.2021 | Examination requested [2022/07] | 08.11.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.02.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 24.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 29.11.2023 | DK | 29.11.2023 | EE | 29.11.2023 | ES | 29.11.2023 | HR | 29.11.2023 | LT | 29.11.2023 | LV | 29.11.2023 | NL | 29.11.2023 | PL | 29.11.2023 | RO | 29.11.2023 | RS | 29.11.2023 | SE | 29.11.2023 | SK | 29.11.2023 | SM | 29.11.2023 | BG | 29.02.2024 | NO | 29.02.2024 | GR | 01.03.2024 | IS | 29.03.2024 | PT | 01.04.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | CZ | 29.11.2023 | |
DK | 29.11.2023 | ||
EE | 29.11.2023 | ||
ES | 29.11.2023 | ||
HR | 29.11.2023 | ||
LT | 29.11.2023 | ||
LV | 29.11.2023 | ||
NL | 29.11.2023 | ||
PL | 29.11.2023 | ||
RO | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
SE | 29.11.2023 | ||
SM | 29.11.2023 | ||
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
NO | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | DK | 29.11.2023 | |
EE | 29.11.2023 | ||
ES | 29.11.2023 | ||
HR | 29.11.2023 | ||
LT | 29.11.2023 | ||
LV | 29.11.2023 | ||
NL | 29.11.2023 | ||
PL | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
SE | 29.11.2023 | ||
SM | 29.11.2023 | ||
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
NO | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | DK | 29.11.2023 | |
ES | 29.11.2023 | ||
HR | 29.11.2023 | ||
LT | 29.11.2023 | ||
LV | 29.11.2023 | ||
NL | 29.11.2023 | ||
PL | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
SE | 29.11.2023 | ||
SM | 29.11.2023 | ||
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
NO | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | ES | 29.11.2023 | |
HR | 29.11.2023 | ||
LT | 29.11.2023 | ||
LV | 29.11.2023 | ||
NL | 29.11.2023 | ||
PL | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
SE | 29.11.2023 | ||
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
NO | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | ES | 29.11.2023 | |
HR | 29.11.2023 | ||
LT | 29.11.2023 | ||
PL | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
SE | 29.11.2023 | ||
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
NO | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 29.11.2023 | |
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 01.03.2024 | |
IS | 29.03.2024 | Cited in | International search | [XI]FR2131709 (DRESSER IND) [X] 1-12 * figure .; claim - * [I] 13-19; | [A]US4747426 (WEEVERS HENRI H [NL]) [A] 1-19 * column 2, line 40 - column 3, line 10; figure - *; | [XI]US2013015385 (MARICA ADRIAN [US]) [X] 1,2,8,9 * abstract * [I] 3-7,10-19; | [A]WO2018022240 (DRESSER-RAND COMPANY [US]) [A] 1,13* abstract * |